This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/12/2021 at 08:38:02 (UTC).

Cimino et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 Cimino filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen M. Tafoya and Christine M. Arguello. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01905

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kathleen M. Tafoya

Presiding Judge

Christine M. Arguello

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Laura Cimino

Joseph Rothman

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Edward Bukowski

Attorney at Merlin Law Group-Denver

1001 17Th Street, Suite 1150

Denver, CO 80202

Larry E. Bache, Jr.

Attorney at Merlin Law Group

777 S. Harbour Island Blvd., Suite 950

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

Evan Bennett Stephenson

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

Evan M. Blonigen

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/26/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 5/30/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2022 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/9/2021. (evaug) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#18

(#18) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Blonigen, Evan) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#15

(#15) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company All parties do not consent.. (Blonigen, Evan) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

13 #1

Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Bukowski on behalf of Laura Cimino, Joseph RothmanAttorney Jonathan Edward Bukowski added to party Laura Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Edward Bukowski added to party Joseph Rothman(pty:pla) (Bukowski, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Larry E. Bache, Jr on behalf of Laura Cimino, Joseph RothmanAttorney Larry E. Bache, Jr added to party Laura Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Larry E. Bache, Jr added to party Joseph Rothman(pty:pla) (Bache, Larry) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 9/8/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/8/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/15/2021. (evaug ) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#9

(#9) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#7

(#7) STATE COURT ORDER Granting State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by El Paso County District Court Judge Eric Bentley on 6/28/2021. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon State Farm Fire and Casualty Company on 6/14/2021 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, filed by Laura Cimino, Joseph Rothman.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Fire and Casualty Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

State Court - Summons to State Farm

1 #4

State Court - Affidavit of Service on State Farm

1 #2

State Court - Complaint and Jury Demand

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/26/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 5/30/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2022 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/9/2021. (evaug) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Blonigen, Evan) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docket(#17) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/9/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello, and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01905-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, ) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company All parties do not consent.. (Blonigen, Evan) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet)(Blonigen, Evan) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Bukowski on behalf of Laura Cimino, Joseph RothmanAttorney Jonathan Edward Bukowski added to party Laura Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Edward Bukowski added to party Joseph Rothman(pty:pla) (Bukowski, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Larry E. Bache, Jr on behalf of Laura Cimino, Joseph RothmanAttorney Larry E. Bache, Jr added to party Laura Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Larry E. Bache, Jr added to party Joseph Rothman(pty:pla) (Bache, Larry) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 9/8/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/8/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/15/2021. (evaug ) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docket(#8) CASE REASSIGNED. This case was originally assigned incorrectly, therefore has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-1905-KMT. (Text only entry.) Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATE COURT ORDER Granting State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by El Paso County District Court Judge Eric Bentley on 6/28/2021. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon State Farm Fire and Casualty Company on 6/14/2021 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, filed by Laura Cimino, Joseph Rothman.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Fire and Casualty Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from El Paso County District Court, Case Number 2021CV30905. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7958621), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 State Court - Complaint and Jury Demand, #3 State Court - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 State Court - Affidavit of Service on State Farm, #5 State Court - Order Granting State Farm's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #6 State Court - Summons to State Farm, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blonigen, Evan) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Michael Blonigen