This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2023 at 07:25:49 (UTC).

Cig v. USCIS et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 Cig filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against USCIS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00292

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kurtay Cig

Defendants

USCIS

Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas

UR M. JADDOU

Houston Asylum Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sheridan Gary Green

Enes Hajdarpasic

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/21/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 08/22/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 07/21/2023. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 02/21/2024. Deft Expert Report due by 03/22/2024. Discovery due by 05/07/2024. Mediation due by 07/23/2024. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 06/06/2024. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 06/06/2024. Joint Pretrial Order due by 08/22/2024. Docket Call set for 10/15/2024 at 1:30 PM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jennellegonzalez) (Entered: 2/22/2023) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Enes Hajdarpasic to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Enes Hajdarpasic to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kurtay Cig, filed.(Green, Sheridan) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Enes Hajdarpasic to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kurtay Cig, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/4/2023. (Green, Sheridan) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 08/22/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 07/21/2023. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 02/21/2024. Deft Expert Report due by 03/22/2024. Discovery due by 05/07/2024. Mediation due by 07/23/2024. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 06/06/2024. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 06/06/2024. Joint Pretrial Order due by 08/22/2024. Docket Call set for 10/15/2024 at 1:30 PM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jennellegonzalez) (Entered: 2/22/2023) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/21/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to USCIS. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Green, Sheridan) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Green, Sheridan) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketSummons Not Issued as to USCIS due to these deficiencies: Name/Address of Plaintiff Attorney or Plaintiff not present. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed. (RachelWillborg, 4) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Green, Sheridan) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29381712) filed by Kurtay Cig.(Green, Sheridan) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less