This case was last updated from PACER on 08/09/2021 at 12:35:44 (UTC).

Ciccotelli v. Proofpoint, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Ciccotelli filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Proofpoint, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05179

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alex Ciccotelli

Defendants

Jonathan Feiber

Dana Evan

Kevin Harvey

Proofpoint, Inc.

Elizabeth Rafael

Richard Wallace

Kristen Gil

Michael Johnson

Gary Steele

Leyla Seka

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gina M. Serra

Attorney at Rigrodsky Law, P.A.

825 East Gate Boulevard, Suite 300

Garden City, NY 11530

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Dana Evan, Jonathan Feiber, Kristen Gil, Kevin Harvey, Michael Johnson, Proofpoint, Inc., Elizabeth Rafael, Leyla Seka, Gary Steele, Richard Wallace. Document filed by Alex Ciccotelli. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-04925. Document filed by Alex Ciccotelli..(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Dana Evan, Jonathan Feiber, Kristen Gil, Kevin Harvey, Michael Johnson, Proofpoint, Inc., Elizabeth Rafael, Leyla Seka, Gary Steele, Richard Wallace. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24659222)Document filed by Alex Ciccotelli..(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Dana Evan, Jonathan Feiber, Kristen Gil, Kevin Harvey, Michael Johnson, Proofpoint, Inc., Elizabeth Rafael, Leyla Seka, Gary Steele, Richard Wallace. Document filed by Alex Ciccotelli. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 9/27/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-04925-JGK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge John G. Koeltl as possibly related to 21cv4925. (pc) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-04925. Document filed by Alex Ciccotelli..(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Dana Evan, Jonathan Feiber, Kristen Gil, Kevin Harvey, Michael Johnson, Proofpoint, Inc., Elizabeth Rafael, Leyla Seka, Gary Steele, Richard Wallace. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24659222)Document filed by Alex Ciccotelli..(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROOFPOINT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gina M. Serra