This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:08:50 (UTC).

CICCONE et al v. IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CICCONE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05715

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAVEL KELLY

DAVID MORDELL

CATHERINE CICCONE

Defendants

IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

DENNIS MARTIN SPELLMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW J. SCHNEIDER

Attorney at SILVERMAN TROTMAN & SCHNEIDER LLC

1500 Market St Suite 4060, Centre Square - West Tower

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

GARY R. GREMMINGER

Attorney at GERMAN, GALLAGHER & MURTAGH

The Bellevue, Fifth Floor, 200 S. Broad Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

ANDRE J. WEBB

Attorney at GERMAN, GALLAGHER & MURTAGH

200 S. Broad Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(WEBB, ANDRE) Modified on 1/13/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Cert/Reg mail re: served Complaint upon IDS Property Casualty Ins. by Cert/Reg mail on 11/18/2019 (SCHNEIDER, ANDREW) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDRE J. WEBB on behalf of IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (WEBB, ANDRE) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 191101493. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Filing fee $ 411 receipt number PPE207753)(bw, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/9/2019) (bw, ). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(WEBB, ANDRE) Modified on 1/13/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#5) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County. (kw, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Cert/Reg mail re: served Complaint upon IDS Property Casualty Ins. by Cert/Reg mail on 11/18/2019 (SCHNEIDER, ANDREW) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDRE J. WEBB on behalf of IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (WEBB, ANDRE) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 191101493. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Filing fee $ 411 receipt number PPE207753)(bw, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/9/2019) (bw, ). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.