This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:17:27 (UTC).

Ciacci v. United States Probation Office District of Hawaii et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Ciacci filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against United States Probation Office District of Hawaii. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT and KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00672

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Michael K. Ciacci

Waialua, HI 96791

Respondents

United States Probation Office District of Hawaii

USPO Hawaii Supervision Officer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Michael David Nammar

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

Prince Kuhio Federal Building, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Ste 6100, 541-2850

Honolulu, HI 96850

Craig S. Nolan

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

Prince Kuhio Federal Building, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Ste 6100

Honolulu, HI 96850

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) EP: Status Conference held.U.S. Probation Officer, Dan Umemoto, present.Plaintiff will proceed as pro se.Discussion held.Briefing schedule: Government to file an initial memorandum regarding the appropriate mechanism to challenge conditions of supervision by 01/24/2020. Plaintiff to file a Response by 02/07/2020, Government's optional Reply by 02/14/2020.Hearing on Plaintiff's Amended Petition is set for 02/24/2020 at 10:00 am before the Honorable J. Michael Seabright.(Court Reporter Cynthia Fazio.) (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

12 #3

Exhibit B

#17

(#17) EP: Status Conference held. U.S. Probation Officer, Dan Umemoto, present.Discussion held.Further status conference SET for 4/20/2020 at 3:00 pm before the Honorable J. Michael Seabright. Hearing on Plaintiff's Amended Petition is set for 02/24/2020 at 10:00 am before the Honorable J. Michael Seabright is hereby VACATED. (Court Reporter Cynthia Fazio.) (JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY)(tl, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#6

(#6) EP: Status conference held.U.S. Probation Officer, Dan Umemoto, present.Discussion held.Plaintiff is open to representation. Plaintiff will contact and meet with Mr. Peter Wolff, Federal Public Defender, to determine whether the Federal Public Defender can represent the Plaintiff in this matter.Further Status Conference is set for 01/09/2020 at 3:00 pm before the Honorable J. Michael Seabright.Plaintiff to remain on previously imposed conditions of supervised release. (Court Reporter Cynthia Fazio.) (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

12 #5

Amended Petition - Exhibit B

#5

(#5) Local Rules 16.2(b) Scheduling Conference Statement - filed by Michael K. Ciacci (jo) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#8

(#8) Amended Petition - filed by Michael K. Ciacci (jo) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael David Nammar on behalf of United States Probation Office District of Hawaii (Nammar, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

11 #2

Exhibit 2

16 #1

*Restricted*

#12

(#12) MOTION To Supplement #8 Amended Petition - filed by Petitioner Michael K. Ciacci (Attachments: #1 Service of Process, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Amended Petition - Exhibit A, #5 Amended Petition - Exhibit B) (jo) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#16

(#16) MOTION to Supplement #8 Amended Petition - filed by Petitioner Michael K. Ciacci (Attachments: #1 Appendix C) (jo) Attachment 1 restricted to case participants as it contains personal identifiers on 2/14/2020 (jo) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig S. Nolan on behalf of United States Probation Office District of Hawaii (Nolan, Craig) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

12 #1

Service of Process

12 #4

Amended Petition - Exhibit A

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM re #10 Status Conference, Set Hearings, Concerning Jurisdiction; Certificate of Service filed by USPO Hawaii Supervision Officer, United States Probation Office District of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Nolan, Craig) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

12 #2

Exhibit A

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) EP: Status Conference held. U.S. Probation Officer, Dan Umemoto, present.Discussion held.Further status conference SET for 4/20/2020 at 3:00 pm before the Honorable J. Michael Seabright. Hearing on Plaintiff's Amended Petition is set for 02/24/2020 at 10:00 am before the Honorable J. Michael Seabright is hereby VACATED. (Court Reporter Cynthia Fazio.) (JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY)(tl, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Supplement #8 Amended Petition - filed by Petitioner Michael K. Ciacci (Attachments: #1 Appendix C) (jo) Attachment 1 restricted to case participants as it contains personal identifiers on 2/14/2020 (jo) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#15) EO: Status Conference set for 02/14/2020 at 2:15 pm will be held in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket(#14) EO: Status Conference set for 02/14/2020 at 2:15 pm in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT is move to Courtroom 7. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket(#13) EO: Status Conference is set for 02/14/2020 at 02:15 PM in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION To Supplement #8 Amended Petition - filed by Petitioner Michael K. Ciacci (Attachments: #1 Service of Process, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Amended Petition - Exhibit A, #5 Amended Petition - Exhibit B) (jo) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM re #10 Status Conference, Set Hearings, Concerning Jurisdiction; Certificate of Service filed by USPO Hawaii Supervision Officer, United States Probation Office District of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Nolan, Craig) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EP: Status Conference held.U.S. Probation Officer, Dan Umemoto, present.Plaintiff will proceed as pro se.Discussion held.Briefing schedule: Government to file an initial memorandum regarding the appropriate mechanism to challenge conditions of supervision by 01/24/2020. Plaintiff to file a Response by 02/07/2020, Government's optional Reply by 02/14/2020.Hearing on Plaintiff's Amended Petition is set for 02/24/2020 at 10:00 am before the Honorable J. Michael Seabright.(Court Reporter Cynthia Fazio.) (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig S. Nolan on behalf of United States Probation Office District of Hawaii (Nolan, Craig) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael David Nammar on behalf of United States Probation Office District of Hawaii (Nammar, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Amended Petition - filed by Michael K. Ciacci (jo) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EP: Status conference held.U.S. Probation Officer, Dan Umemoto, present.Discussion held.Plaintiff is open to representation. Plaintiff will contact and meet with Mr. Peter Wolff, Federal Public Defender, to determine whether the Federal Public Defender can represent the Plaintiff in this matter.Further Status Conference is set for 01/09/2020 at 3:00 pm before the Honorable J. Michael Seabright.Plaintiff to remain on previously imposed conditions of supervised release. (Court Reporter Cynthia Fazio.) (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Local Rules 16.2(b) Scheduling Conference Statement - filed by Michael K. Ciacci (jo) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docket(#4) EO: Status Conference is set for 01/03/2020 at 01:30 PM in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30AM on 2/24/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(ens) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Petitioner Michael K. Ciacci. (ens) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS and Request for Court Order; Exhibits A,B - filed by Michael K. Ciacci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) Note: Attachment 1 is restricted to case participants due to the disclosure of personal identifiers(ens) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.