This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2023 at 10:36:48 (UTC).

Church v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Church filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-14023

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stanley Church

Defendants

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation

Chattem, Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

Patheon Manufacturing Service LLC

Pfizer Inc.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC

Apotex Corporation

Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.

Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp.

L. Perrigo Co.

Ranbaxy Inc.

Strides Pharma, Inc.

Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Teva Pharmaceticals U.S.A., Inc.

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roopal Premchand Luhana

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stanley Church. Apotex Corporation waiver sent on 3/9/2023, response/answer due 5/8/2023. (Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stanley Church. Apotex Corporation waiver sent on 3/9/2023, response/answer due 5/8/2023. (Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. Case is stayed and closed per Pretrial Order #80 in 20-MD-2924-RLR. (vjk) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • Docket(#2) MDL 2924 Judge Assignment with Tag-Along Case Receipt from the Southern District of Florida. Judge Robin L. Rosenberg assigned FLSD Case Number 3:23-cv-14023. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-MD-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified. (vjk) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Stanley Church against Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Apotex Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Chattem, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp., GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, L. Perrigo Co., Patheon Manufacturing Service LLC, Pfizer Inc., Ranbaxy Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Strides Pharma, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Teva Pharmaceticals U.S.A., Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Wockhardt USA LLC, Wockhardt USA, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16361679, filed by Stanley Church. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less