This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/13/2021 at 07:55:43 (UTC).

Church of the Nativity v. GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Church of the Nativity filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tony N. Leung and Patrick J. Schiltz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-01398

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tony N. Leung

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Church of the Nativity doing business as Nativity Episcopal Church

Defendant

GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marcus Patrick Zelzer

Attorney at Smith Jadin Johnson, PLLC

7900 Xerxes Avenue South, Ste 2020

Bloomington, MN 55431

Alexander M Jadin

Attorney at Smith Jadin Johnson, PLLC

7900 Xerxes Avenue S, Suite 2020

Bloomington, MN 55431

Defendant Attorneys

Dennis Charles Anderson

Attorney at Zelle LLP

500 Washington Avenue South, Ste 4000

Minneapolis, MN 55415

Lindsey A Davis

Attorney at Zelle LLP

500 Washington Avenue South, Suite 4000

Minneapolis, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

#25

#24

23 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#23

21 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#21

20 #2

Exhibit(s) 2

20 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#12

#10

#9

#6

#5

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#1

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER denying #12 Motion to Compel. See Order for details. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 8/9/2021. (ecw) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus Patrick Zelzer on behalf of Church of the Nativity. (Zelzer, Marcus) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Reply to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Compel Appraisal, to Compel Defendant to Name a New Appraiser, and Stay Litigation filed by Church of the Nativity. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jadin, Alexander) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: : Motion Hearing re #12 MOTION to Compel Appraisal, to Compel Defendant to Name a New Appraiser, and Stay Litigation set for 7/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz is CANCELED. The motion will be considered by the Court on the submissions of the parties without oral argument. (CLG) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Compel Appraisal, to Compel Defendant to Name a New Appraiser, and Stay Litigation filed by GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Davis, Lindsey) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) DECLARATION of Lindsey A. Davis in Opposition to #12 MOTION to Compel Appraisal, to Compel Defendant to Name a New Appraiser, and Stay Litigation filed by GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Davis, Lindsey) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER on #2 Stipulation. GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company answer due 8/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/18/2021. (EB) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #12 Motion to Compel filed by Church of the Nativity.(Jadin, Alexander) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 MOTION to Compel Appraisal, to Compel Defendant to Name a New Appraiser, and Stay Litigation filed by Church of the Nativity.(Jadin, Alexander) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AFFIDAVIT of Dennis McClay in SUPPORT OF #12 MOTION to Compel Appraisal, to Compel Defendant to Name a New Appraiser, and Stay Litigation filed by Church of the Nativity.(Jadin, Alexander) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander M Jadin on behalf of Church of the Nativity. (Jadin, Alexander) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company. (Davis, Lindsey) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER that #5 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Name a New Appraiser, to Compel Appraisal, MOTION to Stay Litigation, filed by Plaintiff Church of the Nativity, #6 MOTION for Removal from the Expedited Litigation Track filed by Plaintiff Church of the Nativity is/are not properly before this court and therefore denied without prejudice. In order to be considered, any motion previously filed in state court must be refiled in compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this District. Orders entered by the state court prior to removal remain in effect. Approved by the Court on 6/14/2021. (lmb) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE re #5 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Name a New Appraiser, to Compel Appraisal, MOTION to Stay Litigation, #6 MOTION for Removal from the Expedited Litigation Track are copies of documents filed in Dakota County District Court. (lmb) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Removal from the Expedited Litigation Track filed by Church of the Nativity. (lmb) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Compel Defendant to Name a New Appraiser, to Compel Appraisal, MOTION to Stay Litigation, filed by Church of the Nativity. (lmb) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Marcus P. Zelzer as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (lmb) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-1398 (PJS/TNL). (lmb) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STIPULATION to Amend Case Schedule and Joint Request for Telephone Conference by Guideone Specialty Mutual Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Church of the Nativity d/b/a Nativity Episcopal Church. (Anderson, Dennis) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dakota County, case number 19HA-CV-21-1672 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8817118) filed by Guideone Specialty Mutual Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Lindsey) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GUIDEONE SPECIALTY MUTUAL INSURANCE AS SUBROGEE OF PARK BIXBY TOWER INC. is a litigant