This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 10:16:38 (UTC).

Churba v. Esquenazi

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Churba filed a Tax - Third Party Tax Summon lawsuit against Esquenazi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie Abrams. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02655

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Third Party Tax Summon

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie Abrams

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Aaron Churba

Respondent

Denise Esquenazi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

James John Mahon

Attorney at Becker & Poliakoff, LLP

45 Broadway, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-02370-RA. Document filed by Aaron Churba.(Mahon, James) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#6

(#7) ORDER: These cases were incorrectly filed as civil cases. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that they be closed. Counsel must file these cases under a miscellaneous docket and may contact the Miscellaneous Clerk at (212)-805-0800 for further information. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/11/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Denise Esquenazi, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Aaron Churba. (Mahon, James) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Aaron Churba.(Mahon, James) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mahon, James) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) PETITION to Quash. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16557370).Document filed by Aaron Churba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Mahon, James) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: These cases were incorrectly filed as civil cases. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that they be closed. Counsel must file these cases under a miscellaneous docket and may contact the Miscellaneous Clerk at (212)-805-0800 for further information. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/11/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-02370-RA. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-02370-RA. Document filed by Aaron Churba.(Mahon, James) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • CASE REFERRED TO Judge Ronnie Abrams as possibly related to 19CV2370. (pne) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney James John Mahon, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pne) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Denise Esquenazi, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Aaron Churba. (Mahon, James) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Aaron Churba.(Mahon, James) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mahon, James) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION to Quash. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16557370).Document filed by Aaron Churba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Mahon, James) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.