This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2021 at 08:17:23 (UTC).

Chung v. County of Santa Clara et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 Chung filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of Santa Clara. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucy H. Koh and Nathanael M. Cousins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-07583

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lucy H. Koh

Referral Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Chung

Defendants

County of Santa Clara

Jeffrey F Rosen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James McManis

Attorney at McManis Faulkner

50 West San Fernando Street, 10Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95113

Abimael J. Bastida De Jesus

Attorney at McManis Faulkner

50 W. San Fernando Street, 10Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95113

Defendant Attorneys

Claire T. Cormier

Attorney at County of Santa Clara

70 W. Hedding Street, East-Wing, 9Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95110

Xavier Mark Brandwajn

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1950 University Avenue, 5Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

 

Court Documents

20 #2

Proposed Order

20 #1

Exhibit A

20 #20

Main Document

18 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

18 #18

Main Document

#16

(#16) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Santa Clara, Jeffrey F Rosen.. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 11/1/2021) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation for extension of time to respond to Complaint filed by County of Santa Clara, Jeffrey F Rosen. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 10/22/2021) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Claire T. Cormier (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 10/22/2021) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Xavier Mark Brandwajn (Brandwajn, Xavier) (Filed on 10/22/2021) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Daniel Chung (Bastida De Jesus, Abimael) (Filed on 10/1/2021) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Abimael J. Bastida De Jesus (Bastida De Jesus, Abimael) (Filed on 10/1/2021) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

6 #1

Summons

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by County of Santa Clara, Jeffrey F Rosen. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2022 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 12/7/2021. Replies due by 12/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Brandwajn, Xavier) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Docket(#19) CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH. Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for February 9, 2022 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due seven days prior to the Initial Case Management Conference. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ked, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 11/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docket(#17) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Santa Clara, Jeffrey F Rosen.. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 11/1/2021) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation for extension of time to respond to Complaint filed by County of Santa Clara, Jeffrey F Rosen. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 10/22/2021) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Claire T. Cormier (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 10/22/2021) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Xavier Mark Brandwajn (Brandwajn, Xavier) (Filed on 10/22/2021) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Defendants are requested to file their consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/2/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2021) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Daniel Chung.. (McManis, James) (Filed on 10/12/2021) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Chung. Jeffrey F Rosen served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Bastida De Jesus, Abimael) (Filed on 10/5/2021) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Chung. County of Santa Clara served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Bastida De Jesus, Abimael) (Filed on 10/5/2021) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Daniel Chung (Bastida De Jesus, Abimael) (Filed on 10/1/2021) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Abimael J. Bastida De Jesus (Bastida De Jesus, Abimael) (Filed on 10/1/2021) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to County of Santa Clara, Jeffrey F Rosen. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/12/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (McManis, James) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (McManis, James) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16440637.). Filed byDaniel Chung. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McManis, James) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Xavier M. Brandwajn Esquire

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Claire Truxaw Cormier Esquire