This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:12:25 (UTC).

Chuey v. Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Chuey filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John R. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01568

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shawna L. Chuey

Girard, OH 44420

Defendant

Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Brian T. Winchester

Attorney at McNeal, Schick, Archibald & Biro

4608 St. Clair Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44103

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Shawna L. Chuey. Related document(s) #14 , #13 .(P,G) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#14

(#14) Declaration of Untimely Filing Due to Technical Difficulites filed by Shawna L. Chuey. Related document(s) #13 .(P,G) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#13

(#13) Notice of Manual Filing of Report of Parties' Planning Meeting filed by Shawna L. Chuey. (P,G) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#12

(#12) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. (Winchester, Brian) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#11

(#11) Demand Statement filed by Shawna L. Chuey. Related document(s) #9 , #8 . (P,G) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#10

(#10) Initial Disclosures filed by Shawna L. Chuey. Related document(s) #9 , #8 .(P,G) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#9

(#9) Declaration of Untimely Filing filed by Shawna L. Chuey. Related document(s) #8 .(P,G) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#8

(#8) Notice of Manual Filing of Initial Disclosures, Demand Statement, Declaration that Party Was Unable to File in a Timely Manner filed by Shawna L. Chuey. (P,G) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#7

(#7) Notice of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. (Winchester, Brian) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

6 #5

Policy and Procedure Manual

6 #4

Budget

#5

(#5) Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. (Winchester, Brian) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#4

(#4) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,Ke) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Winchester, Brian) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. (Winchester, Brian) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit Docket

1 #1

Exhibit Trumbull County Complaint

#1

(#5) Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. (Winchester, Brian) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Shawna L. Chuey. Related document(s) #14 , #13 .(P,G) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Declaration of Untimely Filing Due to Technical Difficulites filed by Shawna L. Chuey. Related document(s) #13 .(P,G) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Manual Filing of Report of Parties' Planning Meeting filed by Shawna L. Chuey. (P,G) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. (Winchester, Brian) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Demand Statement filed by Shawna L. Chuey. Related document(s) #9 , #8 . (P,G) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Initial Disclosures filed by Shawna L. Chuey. Related document(s) #9 , #8 .(P,G) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Declaration of Untimely Filing filed by Shawna L. Chuey. Related document(s) #8 .(P,G) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Manual Filing of Initial Disclosures, Demand Statement, Declaration that Party Was Unable to File in a Timely Manner filed by Shawna L. Chuey. (P,G) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. (Winchester, Brian) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of #6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order mailed to Shawna L. Chuey at 436 E. Prospect Street, Girard, OH 44420 on 7/30/20. Related document(s) #6 . (K,C) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Telephone Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 9/14/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge John R. Adams. Defendant shall prepare the conference call-in information and provide the number to all parties and the Court two business days prior to the conference. Counsel and party representatives to attend. Judge John R. Adams on 7/29/20. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties, #2 Rule 30.1, #3 Consent to Magistrate Judge, #4 Budget, #5 Policy and Procedure Manual)(K,C) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. (Winchester, Brian) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCopy of Docket Sheet mailed to Shawna L. Chuey, 436 E. Prospect Street, Girard, OH 44420 on 7/16/2020. (S,Ke) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketFILING ERROR - Notice by Clerk that Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (S,Ke) Modified to denote filing error on 7/16/2020 (S,Ke). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,Ke) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,Ke) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketJudge John R. Adams assigned to case. (S,Ke) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Winchester, Brian) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. (Winchester, Brian) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Trumbull County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020cv00723 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10110136.. Filed by Auto-Owners Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trumbull County Complaint, #2 Exhibit Docket) (Winchester, Brian) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less