This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/18/2021 at 08:15:57 (UTC).

Chuck Batcheller Co., Inc. v. Hughson Nut, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 Chuck Batcheller Co , Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hughson Nut, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David M. Lawson and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-11930

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David M. Lawson

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chuck Batcheller Co., Inc.

Defendant

Hughson Nut, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Randall J. Gillary

Attorney at Randall J. Gillary Assoc.

201 W. Big Beaver Road, Suite 1020

Troy, MI 48084

Kevin P. Albus

Attorney at Randall J. Gillary Assoc.

201 W. Big Beaver Road, Suite 1020

Troy, MI 48084

Defendant Attorneys

Conor T. Fitzpatrick

Attorney at Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone, PLC

150 W Jefferson Avenue, Suite 2500

Detroit, MI 48226

Frederick A. Acomb

Attorney at Miller, Canfield,

150 W. Jefferson Avenue, Suite 2500

Detroit, MI 48226-4415

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER of Referral to Facilitative Mediation. TELEPHONIC Post ADR Status Conference set for 11/10/2021 at 10:30 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Interim Status Conference set for 10/13/2021 at 4:00 PM; Discovery due by 1/31/2022; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/17/2022; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2022 at 3:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (Refer to image for additional dates) (SPin) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings before District Judge David M. Lawson: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/1/2021. (SPin) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER vacating clerk's entry of default against defendant (filed in state court). Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (DPer) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Albus, Kevin) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2021 at 2:30 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (See image for document deadline.) (SPin) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION to Set Aside Entry of Default by Hughson Nut, Inc. (Acomb, Frederick) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Chuck Batcheller Co., Inc. (Gillary, Randall) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Hughson Nut, Inc.. (Acomb, Frederick) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Hughson Nut, Inc. (Fitzpatrick, Conor) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. Albus on behalf of Chuck Batcheller Co., Inc.. (Albus, Kevin) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Randall J. Gillary on behalf of Chuck Batcheller Co., Inc.. (Gillary, Randall) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (KBro) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ADDENDUM re #1 Notice of Removal, Additional State Court Documents (28 U.S.C. 1446(a)) by Hughson Nut, Inc. (Fitzpatrick, Conor) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Conor T. Fitzpatrick on behalf of Hughson Nut, Inc.. (Fitzpatrick, Conor) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hughson Nut, Inc. from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2021-188624-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8584558 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Acomb, Frederick) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frederick A. Acomb

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Conor T. Fitzpatrick