This case was last updated from PACER on 09/02/2021 at 20:09:36 (UTC).

Chubchai et al v. AbbVie Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 Chubchai filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against AbbVie Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-04099

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Emily McGoldrick

Phornphan Chubchai

Javier Valencia

Paula Brooks

Emily Michelle McGoldrick

Defendants

AbbVie Inc.

Allergan, Inc.

Allergan plc

Zeltiq Aesthetics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alex R. Straus

Attorney at Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC

280 South Beverly Drive, Suite Ph

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Jonathan Betten Cohen

Attorney at Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC

800 S. Gay Street, Suite 1100

Knoxville, TN 37929

Louiza Tarassova

Attorney at Lou Law

2180 N. Park Avenue, Suite 208

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendant Attorneys

Troy Masami Yoshino

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Amy Pepke

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP

6075 Poplar Avenue, Suite 500

Memphis, TN 38119

 

Court Documents

26 #20

Exhibit 20

26 #19

Exhibit 19

26 #18

Exhibit 18

26 #15

Exhibit 15

26 #1

Exhibit 1

#26

(#26) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint or to Stay the Case ) filed byPaula Brooks, Phornphan Chubchai, Javier Valencia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Straus, Alex) (Filed on 8/27/2021) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

17 #7

Exhibit 7

17 #3

Exhibit 3

#17

(#23) STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF CERTAIN DEADLINES re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint or to Stay the Case filed by Paula Brooks, Phornphan Chubchai, Javier Valencia, AbbVie Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alex R. Straus in Support of Stipulated Request)(Straus, Alex) (Filed on 8/10/2021) Modified on 8/10/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#9

(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 06/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2021) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Paula Brooks, Phornphan Chubchai, Emily Michelle McGoldrick, Javier Valencia.. (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 6/11/2021) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to AbbVie Inc. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/20/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2021 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 5/28/2021) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Paula Brooks, Phornphan Chubchai, Emily McGoldrick, Javier Valencia . (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 5/28/2021) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

1 #1

Declaration

#1

(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against AbbVie Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0971-16024689). Filed by Phornphan Chubchai, Paula Brooks, Javier Valencia, Emily McGoldrick. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Straus, Alex) (Filed on 5/28/2021) Modified on 6/1/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/28/2021)

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint or to Stay the Case ) filed byPaula Brooks, Phornphan Chubchai, Javier Valencia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Straus, Alex) (Filed on 8/27/2021) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Amy Pepke. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2021) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint or to Stay the Case. Responses due by 8/27/2021. Replies due by 9/10/2021. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2021 02:00 PM VIA ZOOM WEBINAR Videoconference Only before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER [*AS AMENDED BY THE COURT*] by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #23 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2021. Replies due by 9/10/2021. Responses due by 8/27/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2021 09:00 AM VIA ZOOM WEBINAR Videoconference Only. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2021 02:00 PM VIA ZOOM WEBINAR Videoconference Only before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF CERTAIN DEADLINES re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint or to Stay the Case filed by Paula Brooks, Phornphan Chubchai, Javier Valencia, AbbVie Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alex R. Straus in Support of Stipulated Request)(Straus, Alex) (Filed on 8/10/2021) Modified on 8/10/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 8/9/2021) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Amy Pepke (Filing fee $317, receipt number 0971-16263150) filed by AbbVie Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pepke, Amy) (Filed on 8/9/2021) Modified on 8/9/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 8/6/2021) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Yoshino, Troy) (Filed on 8/6/2021) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 10/4/2021 at specially set time of 09:00 AM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/gonzalez-rogers-yvonne-ygr/ (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by AbbVie Inc., Paula Brooks, Phornphan Chubchai, Emily Michelle McGoldrick, Javier Valencia. (Yoshino, Troy) (Filed on 6/23/2021) Modified on 6/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 06/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2021) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Paula Brooks, Phornphan Chubchai, Emily Michelle McGoldrick, Javier Valencia.. (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 6/11/2021) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to AbbVie Inc. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/20/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2021 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/15/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 5/28/2021) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Paula Brooks, Phornphan Chubchai, Emily McGoldrick, Javier Valencia . (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 5/28/2021) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against AbbVie Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0971-16024689). Filed by Phornphan Chubchai, Paula Brooks, Javier Valencia, Emily McGoldrick. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Straus, Alex) (Filed on 5/28/2021) Modified on 6/1/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZELTIQ AESTHETICS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AbbVie, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Allergan PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex R. Straus