This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2021 at 08:50:17 (UTC).

Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas v. Nidec Motor Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against Nidec Motor Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01057

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas

Defendants

Lennox Industries Inc.

Nidec Motor Corporation

Emerson Electric Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Steven Schulze

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1221 Mckinney St, Ste 2900

Houston, TX 77010

Defendant Attorneys

Randy Donato

Attorney at Donato, Brown, Pool & Moehlmann, PLLC

3200 Southwest Fwy, Ste 2300

Houston, TX 77027-7525

William Ernest Calvert, II

Attorney at J. Diamond and Associates, PLLC

730 North Loop

Houston, TX 770009

Nicholas David Stepp

Attorney at Husch Blackwell

600 Travis Street, Suite 2350

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#13

12 #4

Exhibit D

12 #3

Exhibit C

12 #2

Exhibit B

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

#8

#7

#3

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Amended CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas identifying Federal Insurance Company; Chubb INA Holdings, Inc; Chubb Group Holdings, Inc.; Chubb Limited as Corporate Parent, filed.(Schulze, Jason) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) OBJECTIONS to #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement , filed by Nidec Motor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Stepp, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's re: #9 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas, filed. (Schulze, Jason) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Calvert, II on behalf of Lennox Industries Inc., filed. (Calvert, William) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Opposed MOTION to Remand by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schulze, Jason) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Lennox Industries Inc., filed.(Donato, Randy) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss and Answer by Nidec Motor Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/11/2021. (Stepp, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nidec Motor Corporation, filed.(Stepp, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Nidec Motor Corporation served on 4/12/2021, answer due 5/3/2021, filed.(Schulze, Jason) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Lennox Industries Inc. served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021, filed.(Schulze, Jason) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas identifying Chubb INA Holdings, Inc; Chubb Group Holdings, Inc.; Chubb Limited; Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Schulze, Jason) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/6/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 333rd JDC, Harris County, Texas, case number 2021-18422 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26199731) filed by Nidec Motor Corporation fka Emerson Electric Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Stepp, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas is a litigant

Latest cases where NIDEC MOTOR CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where LENNOX INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Emerson Electric Co. is a litigant