This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2021 at 07:06:49 (UTC).

Chu v. Preferred Hotel Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Chu filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Preferred Hotel Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kandis A. Westmore and Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01551

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kandis A. Westmore

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kyo Hak Chu

Defendant

Preferred Hotel Group, Inc. doing business as Preferred Hotels & Resorts

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thiago Merlini Coelho

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Jasmine Behroozan

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm, PLC

3055 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin Robert King

Attorney at Attorney at Law

10100 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4120

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#15

#13

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 4/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Preferred Hotel Group, Inc... (King, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/27/2021) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/11/2021. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #9 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. REMINDER: Case division and case location information are incorrect. In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as Oakland Division and the case number should be 4:21-cv-1551 KAW. [err102] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days filed by Preferred Hotel Group, Inc. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2021) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/26/2021. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days filed by Preferred Hotel Group, Inc., and Kyo Hak Chu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(King, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/12/2021) Modified on 4/13/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kyo Hak Chu.. (Coelho, Thiago) (Filed on 3/30/2021) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyo Hak Chu. Preferred Hotel Group, Inc. served on 3/23/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Coelho, Thiago) (Filed on 3/24/2021) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/5/2021. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Preferred Hotel Group, Inc.. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/18/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Coelho, Thiago) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Preferred Hotel Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15655361.). Filed byKyo Hak Chu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coelho, Thiago) (Filed on 3/4/2021) Modified on 3/5/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP INC is a litigant