This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2021 at 08:26:11 (UTC).

CHS INC. v. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 CHS INC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beryl A. Howell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02017

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beryl A. Howell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHS INC.

Defendants

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY

CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.

NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan W. Dettmann

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

90 S. 7Th St., Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Craig S. Coleman

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

90 S. 7Th St., Ste. 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

George T. Caplan

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH

1800 Century Park East, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kristopher S. Davis

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

1800 Century Park East, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

William Roberts

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

90 S. 7Th St., Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew M. Collette

Attorney at MASSEY & GAIL LLP

1000 Maine Avenue S.W., Suite 450

Washington, DC 20024

Alethea Anne Swift

Attorney at MASSEY & GAIL LLP

1000 Maine Avenue Sw, Suite 450

Washington, DC 20024

Linda Sue Stein

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Molly Bruder Fox

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Juan Arteaga

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

590 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Eric Fanchiang

Attorney at CROWELL& MORING LLP

3 Park Plaza, Ste 20 Flr

Irvine, CA 92614

Kent Alan Gardiner

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Luke P. van Houwelingen

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W., 1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2595

Mara Lieber

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

590 Madison Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Tara L. Reinhart

Attorney at SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM LLP

1440 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#34

(#34) NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sue Stein on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#33

(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Bruder Fox on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Fox, Molly) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#31

(#31) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (CHS Inc. v. Union Pacific Railroad Company, et al., No. 1:21-cv-02017-BAH) by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Arteaga, Juan) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by Mara Lieber on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Lieber, Mara) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#28

(#28) NOTICE of Appearance by Luke P. van Houwelingen on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (van Houwelingen, Luke) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#26

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

16 #1

*Restricted*

16 #16

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by CHS Inc.. BNSF Railway Company waiver sent on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (Roberts, William) [Transferred from Minnesota on 7/28/2021.] (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#7

(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff CHS Inc.. (Roberts, William) [Transferred from Minnesota on 7/28/2021.] (Entered: 07/01/2021)

1 #1

Main Document

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY.(Stein, Linda) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sue Stein on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Bruder Fox on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Fox, Molly) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand (CHS Inc. v. Union Pacific Railroad Company, et al., No. 1:21-cv-02017-BAH) by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC..(Arteaga, Juan) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (CHS Inc. v. Union Pacific Railroad Company, et al., No. 1:21-cv-02017-BAH) by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Arteaga, Juan) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Fanchiang on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Fanchiang, Eric) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by Mara Lieber on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Lieber, Mara) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Appearance by Luke P. van Houwelingen on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (van Houwelingen, Luke) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Alan Gardiner on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Gardiner, Kent) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by CHS Inc.. Norfolk Southern Railway Company waiver sent on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (Roberts, William) [Transferred from Minnesota on 7/28/2021.] (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by CHS Inc.. CSX Transportation, Inc. waiver sent on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (Roberts, William) [Transferred from Minnesota on 7/28/2021.] (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by CHS Inc.. BNSF Railway Company waiver sent on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (Roberts, William) [Transferred from Minnesota on 7/28/2021.] (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff CHS Inc.. (Roberts, William) [Transferred from Minnesota on 7/28/2021.] (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docket(#6) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 7/28/2021.] (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#5) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) [Transferred from Minnesota on 7/28/2021.] (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing George T. Caplan, Kristopher S. Davis as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 7/28/2021.] (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 7/28/2021.] (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-1519 (WMW/HB). (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 7/28/2021.] (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8853662) filed by CHS Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Roberts, William) [Transferred from Minnesota on 7/28/2021.] (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where C.H.G. is a litigant

Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CSX Transportation Inc is a litigant