Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 05:55:41 (UTC).

CHS Inc. v. ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 CHS Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth K. Dillon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-00788

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth K. Dillon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHS Inc.

CHS Inc. doing business as Commonwealth Linen Services

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc.

3Rd Party Defendant

Rectors and Visitors of the University of Virginia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth Guilbert Perrow

Attorney at Woods Rogers PLC

10 S. Jefferson Street, Suite 1400

Roanoke, VA 24011

John Benjamin Rottenborn

Attorney at Woods Rogers PLC

10 S. Jefferson Street, Suite 1400

Roanoke, VA 24011

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

John David McGavin

Attorney at Bancroft, McGavin, Horvath, & Judkins, PC

9990 Fairfax Blvd., Suite 400

Fairfax, VA 22030

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Scheduling Letter (bwd)

#8

(#8) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ABM Industries, Inc. for ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc.. (McGavin, John)

6 #1

Exhibit Contract

#6

(#6) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Rectors and Visitors of the University of Virginia, filed by ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract)(McGavin, John)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc..(McGavin, John)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHS Inc.. ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc. served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019.(Rottenborn, John)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ck)

#2

(#2) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHS Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Carilion Clinic for CHS Inc.. (ck)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt # 0423-3276958), filed by CHS Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ck)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Scheduling Letter (bwd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ABM Industries, Inc. for ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc.. (McGavin, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • (#7) Notice of Filing Requirement to ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ck)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Rectors and Visitors of the University of Virginia, filed by ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract)(McGavin, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc..(McGavin, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHS Inc.. ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc. served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019.(Rottenborn, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ck)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHS Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Carilion Clinic for CHS Inc.. (ck)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt # 0423-3276958), filed by CHS Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ck)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABM HEALTHCARE SUPPORT SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA is a litigant

Latest cases where C.H.G. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Benjamin Rottenborn