This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2019 at 07:34:41 (UTC).

Chrzasvcz v. Zurich American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 Chrzasvcz filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Zurich American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sean P. Flynn and Steven D. Merryday. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00046

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Merryday

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bozena Chrzasvcz

Defendant

Zurich American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven E. Hovsepian

Attorney at Barbas, Nunez, Sanders, Butler & Hovsepian

1802 W Cleveland St

Tampa, FL 33606-1852

Defendant Attorney

Jason Benjamin Bloom

Attorney at Lydecker Diaz

1221 Brickell Ave 19Th Flr

Miami, FL 33131-3240

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER re the #13 --notice of settlement; dismissing this action; directing the clerk to terminate any pending motion and close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/4/2019. (GSO) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of settlement in Full and Motion for Enlargement of Time by Zurich American Insurance Company (Bloom, Jason) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#12

(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Amended MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Bozena Chrzasvcz. (Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #1 Notice of Removal by Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd. for Zurich American Insurance Company.. (Bloom, Jason) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bozena Chrzasvcz. Related case(s): no (Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

8 #1

Exhibit

#8

(#8) Amended MOTION for More Definite Statement by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bloom, Jason) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER denying without prejudice #6 --motion for more definite statement. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/16/2019. (BK) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) MOTION for More Definite Statement by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bloom, Jason) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER re #4 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/9/2019. (GSO) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 6th Judicial Circuit for Pinellas County, case number 18-007549-CI filed in State Court on 11/19/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-14989422 filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT)(Bloom, Jason) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER re the #13 --notice of settlement; dismissing this action; directing the clerk to terminate any pending motion and close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/4/2019. (GSO) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of settlement in Full and Motion for Enlargement of Time by Zurich American Insurance Company (Bloom, Jason) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Amended MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Bozena Chrzasvcz. (Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #1 Notice of Removal by Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd. for Zurich American Insurance Company.. (Bloom, Jason) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bozena Chrzasvcz. Related case(s): no (Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Amended MOTION for More Definite Statement by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bloom, Jason) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER denying without prejudice #6 --motion for more definite statement. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/16/2019. (BK) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for More Definite Statement by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bloom, Jason) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER re #4 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/9/2019. (GSO) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 1.05 (e): The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. (signed by deputy clerk). (CTR) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-46-T-23SPF. (SJB) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 6th Judicial Circuit for Pinellas County, case number 18-007549-CI filed in State Court on 11/19/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-14989422 filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT)(Bloom, Jason) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Benjamin Bloom(Designation Retained)