This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/14/2021 at 08:19:15 (UTC).

Chrome Cherry Limited v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Chrome Cherry Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Franklin U. Valderrama. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05491

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Franklin U. Valderrama

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chrome Cherry Limited

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Jilin Province Lewei Trade Co., Ltd.

Ningbo New Top Houseware Co., Ltd.

Shenzhen Si Tianrui E-Commerce Co., Ltd.

Shenzhen Tenghui Cross Border E-Commerce Co., Ltd.

Yiwu Wanpincang Supply Chain Co., Ltd.

Punkgirl Store

Homeshopping

Pak Sweetmood Store

AD Store

HUG Store

Shop5196049 Store

Minimalist idea Store

Shop910325121 Store

Shop911113171 Store

Shop911231053 Store

Shop911522007 Store

Factory Dropshiping Wholesales Online Store

CPP DAILY Store

46 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher S Hermanson

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Martin Francis Trainor

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jake Michael Christensen

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker Drive, #2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chrome Cherry Limited as to certain defendant (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#37

(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chrome Cherry Limited as to certain defendants (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#36

(#36) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama on 11/22/2021. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

35 #1

Add and Terminate Party

#35

(#35) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. On the grounds set forth in the motion, Plaintiff's motion for an entry of a preliminary injunction #31 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The following documents are to be unsealed: (1) Schedule A to the Complaint #2 ; (2) Exhibit 1 to the Complaint #3 ; (3) Exhibit 2 the Declaration of Pierre Swart #15 ; and (4) the Temporary Restraining Order #24 . Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd. is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days, instruction can be found in the attachment to this entry. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Add and Terminate Party) (axc). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#34

(#34) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chrome Cherry Limited as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor)(Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#31

(#31) MOTION by Plaintiff Chrome Cherry Limited for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#24

RESTRICTED

#5

#4

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 5

1 #3

Exhibit 4

1 #2

Exhibit 3

1 #1

Exhibit 2

#1

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chrome Cherry Limited as to certain defendant (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chrome Cherry Limited as to certain defendants (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Jilin Province Lewei Trade Co., Ltd., Ningbo New Top Houseware Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Si Tianrui E-Commerce Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Tenghui Cross Border E-Commerce Co., Ltd., Yiwu Wanpincang Supply Chain Co., Ltd., Punkgirl Store, Homeshopping, Pak Sweetmood Store, AD Store, HUG Store, Shop5196049 Store, Minimalist idea Store, Shop910325121 Store, Shop911113171 Store, Shop911231053 Store, Shop911522007 Store, Factory Dropshiping Wholesales Online Store, CPP DAILY Store, Good friends business Store, Libora Store, Nancelelor, liu lin xian yu liang mao yi, shanghangxianlongyingbaihuodian, Rloper-Lop, shen zhen lan ying dian zi shang wu you xian gong, Welcome 2021 90 Off Sale ClearanceWkdgagde, SanMingYuanRenWuYeFuWuPingGuYouXianGongSi, HuiJunGe, shanghangxianxinglianbaihuodian, jianweifengjiancai, DEVELEE, UNLLLL, Primojoy, coedfa, shanghangxianyuanyuanbaihuodian, star-star turning, liangliqing, EXCTHINI, 202019XS, MAMaiuh, shanghangxianxinghuabaihuodian, Ephemelease, byclear345, family_qiuniu, ingc7404, runnyday1521, wenlia-66, qwer0123, eleven two, schjympsen, nesemobsch, ManuShopOn, hpjdwpyoh, Creaciones jbelen, Catshop.vicky, jose15, Sandraha, QISHENE, chorizole02, inversiones auto cauchos, discountsd, kongweili05899, WANGMENGQIANG4220 and zhangyiliang3356 added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama on 11/22/2021. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. On the grounds set forth in the motion, Plaintiff's motion for an entry of a preliminary injunction #31 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The following documents are to be unsealed: (1) Schedule A to the Complaint #2 ; (2) Exhibit 1 to the Complaint #3 ; (3) Exhibit 2 the Declaration of Pierre Swart #15 ; and (4) the Temporary Restraining Order #24 . Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd. is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days, instruction can be found in the attachment to this entry. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Add and Terminate Party) (axc). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chrome Cherry Limited as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor)(Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE by Chrome Cherry Limited re MOTION by Plaintiff Chrome Cherry Limited for preliminary injunction #31 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MEMORANDUM by Chrome Cherry Limited in support of motion for preliminary injunction #31 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION by Plaintiff Chrome Cherry Limited for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (cxr, ) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chrome Cherry Limited by Martin Francis Trainor (Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chrome Cherry Limited by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chrome Cherry Limited by Christopher S Hermanson (Hermanson, Christopher) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chrome Cherry Limited by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Chrome Cherry Limited for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Chrome Cherry Limited Exhibit 1 regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Chrome Cherry Limited Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Chrome Cherry Limited; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18772095. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher S Hermanson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin Francis Trainor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jake Michael Christensen