This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/25/2022 at 08:12:16 (UTC).

Christy v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 Christy filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David L. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00924

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Russell Christy

Defendants

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Carla Holzrichter Insurance Agency Inc The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ashton B Poarch

Attorney at Nix Patterson, LLP

512 N. Broadway Ave., Suite 200

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Carole L Dulisse

Attorney at Marr Law Firm

4301 Sw 3Rd St, Suite 110

Oklahoma City, OK 73108

Chad E Ihrig

Attorney at Nix Patterson LLP - AUSTIN

8701 Bee Cave Road, Building 1

Austin, TX 78746

Nicholas A Marr

Attorney at Nix Patterson LLP - OKC

512 N Broadway Ave, Suite 206

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

J Revell Parrish

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway Ave, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Jeffrey D Marr

Attorney at Marr Law Firm

4301 Sw 3Rd St, Suite 110

Oklahoma City, OK 73108

Michael Burrage

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway Ave, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Reggie N Whitten

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway Ave, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Paige A Masters

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy-OKC

Braniff Building, 324 N Robinson Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Timila S Rother

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy-OKC

Braniff Building, 324 N Robinson Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marr, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Discovery Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery and Brief in Support by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

15 #1

Exhibit Nelson Opinion

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) ENTRY of Appearance by Ashton B Poarch on behalf of Russell Christy (Poarch, Ashton) Modified on 12/20/2022: document flattened to optimize CM/ECF display; no other changes made. (ekw). (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#13

(#13) ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas A Marr on behalf of Russell Christy (Marr, Nicholas) Modified on 12/19/2022: document flattened to optimize CM/ECF display; no other changes made. (ekw). (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#12

(#12) ENTRY of Appearance by Chad E Ihrig on behalf of Russell Christy (Ihrig, Chad) Modified on 12/19/2022: document flattened to optimize CM/ECF display; no other changes made. (ekw). (Entered: 12/19/2022)

11 #1

Exhibit Bartholomew Order

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marr, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

9 #7

Exhibit Sang Petition

9 #6

Exhibit Policy

9 #3

Exhibit Traylor Petition

9 #1

Exhibit Chart of Cases

9 #9

Main Document

7 #1

Exhibit 1 - Chart of Cases

7 #7

Main Document

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marr, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Discovery Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery and Brief in Support by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by All Plaintiffs re #7 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Nelson Opinion)(Marr, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ENTRY of Appearance by Ashton B Poarch on behalf of Russell Christy (Poarch, Ashton) Modified on 12/20/2022: document flattened to optimize CM/ECF display; no other changes made. (ekw). (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas A Marr on behalf of Russell Christy (Marr, Nicholas) Modified on 12/19/2022: document flattened to optimize CM/ECF display; no other changes made. (ekw). (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENTRY of Appearance by Chad E Ihrig on behalf of Russell Christy (Ihrig, Chad) Modified on 12/19/2022: document flattened to optimize CM/ECF display; no other changes made. (ekw). (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by All Plaintiffs re #7 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bartholomew Order)(Marr, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marr, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chart of Cases, #2 Exhibit SF Letter - Estimate, #3 Exhibit Traylor Petition, #4 Exhibit Traylor - State Court Docket, #5 Exhibit Renewal Declarations, #6 Exhibit Policy, #7 Exhibit Sang Petition)(Rother, Timila) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Carole L Dulisse on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dulisse, Carole) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Chart of Cases)(Marr, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Marr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Marr, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Rother, Timila) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Paige A Masters on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Masters, Paige) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company . (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Timila S Rother on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Notice of Removal Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4019658. (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2022-4183 filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timila S Rother