This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2021 at 09:13:04 (UTC).

Christopher Wallis v. Plutos Sama Holdings, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 Christopher Wallis filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Plutos Sama Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Josephine L. Staton and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01792

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Wallis

Defendants

Plutos Sama Holdings, Inc.

Matthew Browndorf

Andrew Corcoran

Michael Keadjian

Mark Woodward

Inga Schneider

Melvin Browndorf

Bonnie Browndorf

Jacob Browndorf

Garo Keadjian

Patrick Farenga

Brittney Rowland

Albert O Lissoy

Ira Glasky

GF Capital

Garden Foods, Inc.

Far West Industries

Distressed Capital Management, LLC

DCM-PI, LLC

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marc Y Lazo

Attorney at K and L Law Group

2646 Dupont Drive Suite 60340

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (eva) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#40

(#40) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 21-01 (identical case) by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:21-cv-01792-JLS (KESx). (dta) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

39 #1

Exhibit Ex. A to Notice of Interested Parties

39 #39

Main Document

#38

(#38) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#37

(#37) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#36

(#36) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#35

(#35) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#34

(#34) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#9

(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#1

(#32) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (eva) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 21-01 (identical case) by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:21-cv-01792-JLS (KESx). (dta) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC., a Delaware corporation; MATTHEW BROWNDORF, an individual; ANDREW CORCORAN, individually and as trustee of the Matthew Browndorf Living Trust; MICHAEL KEADJIAN, an individual; MARK WOODWARD, an individual;; INGA SCHNEIDER, an individual; MELVIN BROWNDORF, an individual; BONNIE BROWNDORF, an individual; JACOB BROWNDORF, an individual; GARO KEADJIAN, an individual; PATRICK FARENGA, an individual; BRITTNEY ROWLAND, an individual; AL LISSOY, an individual; IRA GLASKY, an individual; GF CAPITAL,a Nevada corporation; GARDEN FOODS, INC., a Nevada corporation; FAR WEST INDUSTRIES, a California corporation; DISTRESSED CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company; DCM-P1, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; DCM-P2, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; DCM-P3, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; DCM-P4, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; DCM-P5, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; DCM-P6, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; DCM-P7, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; DCM-P8, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; DCM-P9, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; WCCB LAW, LLP, a New York Limited Liability Partnership; WB LAW, LLP, a New York Limited Liability Partnership; KCB LAW GROUP, LLP, a New York Limited Liability Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Notice of Interested Parties)(Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32238249 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Christopher Wallis. (Attorney Marc Y Lazo added to party Christopher Wallis(pty:pla))(Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAR WEST INDUSTRIES is a litigant

Latest cases where Plutos Sama Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc Y Lazo