This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/08/2020 at 16:04:29 (UTC).

Christiansen v. Alterra Mountain Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Christiansen filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Alterra Mountain Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Raymond P. Moore and S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02021

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raymond P. Moore

Referral Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Christiansen

Defendants

Alterra Mountain Company

Ikon Pass, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher James Cormier

Attorney at Burns Charest LLP-DC

4725 Wisconsin Avenue, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20016

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Michael Unthank

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Natalie Elizabeth West

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Ryan William Cooke

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Kathryn A. Reilly

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER. The Joint Motion to Consolidate is GRANTED; Christiansen v. Alterra Mountain Co., 20-cv-02021-RM, is hereby consolidated with 20-cv-01057-RM-SKC for pretrial proceedings; all papers in this consolidated action shall be filed in the lowest case number, No. 20-cv-01057-RM-SKC; and this Order shall also be filed in Civil Action No. 20-cv-02021-RM. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on July 16, 2020. (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Consolidate by Defendants Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc. (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan William Cooke on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc.Attorney Ryan William Cooke added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan William Cooke added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (Cooke, Ryan) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Natalie Elizabeth West on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc.Attorney Natalie Elizabeth West added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Elizabeth West added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (West, Natalie) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Michael Unthank on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc.Attorney Andrew Michael Unthank added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Michael Unthank added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (Unthank, Andrew) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathryn A. Reilly on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc.Attorney Kathryn A. Reilly added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn A. Reilly added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Christiansen. Ikon Pass, Inc. served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Cormier, Christopher) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Christiansen. Alterra Mountain Company served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Cormier, Christopher) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

5 #2

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

5 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT class action against Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7381441)Attorney Christopher James Cormier added to party Mark Christiansen(pty:pla), filed by Mark Christiansen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Cormier, Christopher) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER. The Joint Motion to Consolidate is GRANTED; Christiansen v. Alterra Mountain Co., 20-cv-02021-RM, is hereby consolidated with 20-cv-01057-RM-SKC for pretrial proceedings; all papers in this consolidated action shall be filed in the lowest case number, No. 20-cv-01057-RM-SKC; and this Order shall also be filed in Civil Action No. 20-cv-02021-RM. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on July 16, 2020. (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Consolidate by Defendants Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc. (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan William Cooke on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc.Attorney Ryan William Cooke added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan William Cooke added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (Cooke, Ryan) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Natalie Elizabeth West on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc.Attorney Natalie Elizabeth West added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Elizabeth West added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (West, Natalie) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Michael Unthank on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc.Attorney Andrew Michael Unthank added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Michael Unthank added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (Unthank, Andrew) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathryn A. Reilly on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc.Attorney Kathryn A. Reilly added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn A. Reilly added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Christiansen. Ikon Pass, Inc. served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Cormier, Christopher) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Christiansen. Alterra Mountain Company served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Cormier, Christopher) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon the assignment of this case. Counsel for Plaintiff is advised that there are several actions consolidated for pretrial purposes, with 20-cv-1057-RM-SKC as the lead case. The Court anticipates this case will be consolidated with the lead case for pretrial purposes as well. The deadline for filing any motion to be appointed interim lead and/or liaison counsel was July 13, 2020. The Court is aware this case (20-cv-2021) was filed after the order setting the July 13 deadline was issued in the lead case. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that if counsel for Plaintiff wishes to be considered to be interim lead and/or liaison counsel in the consolidated action, it may do so on or before Friday, July 17, 2020, subject to the limitations set forth in the Minutes of June 18, 2020 (ECF No. 48) in the lead case. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/14/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docket(#6) CASE REASSIGNED.This case was originally assigned incorrectly, therefore has been directly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews.All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02021-RM. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Christopher J Cormier. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Christopher J Cormier. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT class action against Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7381441)Attorney Christopher James Cormier added to party Mark Christiansen(pty:pla), filed by Mark Christiansen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Cormier, Christopher) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ikon Pass, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Alterra Mountain Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher J Cormier