This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/05/2021 at 07:33:28 (UTC).

Christiansen et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 Christiansen filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00907

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mark Christiansen

Mary Lou Christiansen

Defendants

Wright Medical Technology Inc

Wright Medical Group Inc

Microport Orthopedics Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stuart L. Goldenberg

Attorney at Goldenberg Law PLLC

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2150

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

(#3) Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet lack an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (cmn) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet lack an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (cmn) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. Attached are the Order Upon Transfer and Case Management Order No. 1 entered by the Court regarding this matter. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/6/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Mark Christiansen, Mary Lou Christiansen. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT083990.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2021: #2 Civil Cover Sheet Main Document - Correct (submitted 10/15/2021), #3 Main Document - Correct) (jak). (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Microport Orthopedics Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stuart L Goldenberg