Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2020 at 08:01:26 (UTC).

Christiane Clear v. Unum Group

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 Christiane Clear filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Unum Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01974

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christiane Clear

Defendant

Unum Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Corinne Chandler

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Brent Dorian Brehm

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Glenn R Kantor

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Defendant Attorneys

Edith S Shea

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

Daniel W Maguire

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Unum Group amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Christiane Clear(Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SUBSTITUTING CORRECT DEFENDANT by Judge Josephine L. Staton, re Stipulation #12 : Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation (Doc. 12), and good cause appearing therefor, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff will file a First Amended Complaint no later than December 7, 2020, naming Unum Life Insurance Company of America as the Defendant in this action, in place of Unum Group. (bm) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) STIPULATION for Order to File First Amended Complaint Substituting Correct Defendant filed by Defendant Unum Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shea, Edith) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Unum Group answer now due 12/10/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Unum Group.(Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Unum Group(pty:dft))(Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christiane Clear, upon Defendant Unum Group served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Staus, Authorized Agent at CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#9

(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Unum Group. (lh) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Christiane Clear. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christiane Clear, (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christiane Clear. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christiane Clear. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28505692 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Christiane Clear. (Attorney Corinne Chandler added to party Christiane Clear(pty:pla))(Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Unum Group amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Christiane Clear(Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SUBSTITUTING CORRECT DEFENDANT by Judge Josephine L. Staton, re Stipulation #12 : Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation (Doc. 12), and good cause appearing therefor, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff will file a First Amended Complaint no later than December 7, 2020, naming Unum Life Insurance Company of America as the Defendant in this action, in place of Unum Group. (bm) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION for Order to File First Amended Complaint Substituting Correct Defendant filed by Defendant Unum Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shea, Edith) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Unum Group answer now due 12/10/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Unum Group.(Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Unum Group(pty:dft))(Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christiane Clear, upon Defendant Unum Group served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Staus, Authorized Agent at CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Unum Group. (lh) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Christiane Clear. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christiane Clear, (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christiane Clear. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christiane Clear. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28505692 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Christiane Clear. (Attorney Corinne Chandler added to party Christiane Clear(pty:pla))(Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNUM Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brent Dorian Brehm

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Glenn R Kantor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Corinne Chandler