Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/19/2019 at 07:06:31 (UTC).

Christian Dior Couture, S.A. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 Christian Dior Couture, S A filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04151

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christian Dior Couture, S.A.

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Delois Wilkens

wogxz1688

liheng-88

GrandBag

Karen Steinbeck

Ms. Xu Store

borsaitalian.net

Louis Pollock

huajewelry

iawesome Store

Daniel Garcia

Suzette Baker

Goldingot Store

diorshoponline.com

nosesmd.com

ainsdalecricketclub.co.uk

YFGXBH MX Store

TaizhoulingXiu Store

180 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Abby Marie Neu

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/30/2019: Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#37

(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion hearing held. No one appeared on behalf of the Defendants on the Plaintiff's noticed motion. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #33 is granted. Status hearing before the Hon. Robert M. Dow, Jr. set for 10/1/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

36 #1

Declaration of Allyson Martin

#36

(#36) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allyson Martin)(Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #33 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/30/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

34 #2

Exhibit 1

34 #1

Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio

#34

(#34) MEMORANDUM by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #33 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#33

(#33) MOTION by Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#7

(#7) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (gcy, ) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

1 #2

Schedule A

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Christian Dior Couture, S.A.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15950964. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/30/2019: Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion hearing held. No one appeared on behalf of the Defendants on the Plaintiff's noticed motion. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #33 is granted. Status hearing before the Hon. Robert M. Dow, Jr. set for 10/1/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allyson Martin)(Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant ZHANG ZHEN and all other Defendants identified in the Amended Complaint (lma, ) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #33 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/30/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MEMORANDUM by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #33 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MOTION by Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 7/16/2019. Mailed notice(gcy, ) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held. Defendants failed to appear. Ex parte motion to extend the temporary restraining order #28 is granted. A further court hearing is set for 10/1/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Signed order to follow. Mailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of extension of time #28 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/16/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (gcy, ) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (gcy, ) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, ) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Christian Dior Couture, S.A.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15950964. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abby Marie Neu