This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/27/2022 at 09:11:36 (UTC).

Christian Dior Couture, S.A. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 Christian Dior Couture, S A filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Gettleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03386

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Gettleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christian Dior Couture, S.A.

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A

Abr ligat

AC ACE

ADSFJK24017

Arkax XF

Barampes

Blumsmother

blvckmarket.net

bn2gfhg6

Bronzeriddle

buy-bags.shop

Casinos heide

creamhood.com

Eclafatico

Europocentric

everyfactory

Farnker

firstbags.ru

Flustmai

196 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin Tyler Joseph

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Kasey Leigh Ewald

Attorney at Greer, Burns, & Crain, Ltd.

300 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#43

(#43) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#42

(#42) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#41

(#41) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#40

(#40) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/28/2022. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#39

(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Telephonic hearing held on 7/28/2022. No defendants appeared on the hearing. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction as to certain defendants #36 is granted. Telephonic hearing set for 9/19/2022 at 9:15 a.m. The Clerk is directed to unseal Schedule A to the complaint #2 , Exhibit 5 and 6 to the Declaration of Nicolas Lambert #18 #19 #20 and the TRO #25 . Greer, Burns, & Crain Ltd. is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/instructions.Members of the public and media may listen to these proceedings by dialing (888) 684-8852 and using the access code is 1503395. Counsel of record and other essential case participants will receive an email prior to the start of the telephone hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 07/28/2022)

36 #2

Errata 2

36 #1

Exhibit 1

36 #36

Main Document

#25

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#2

(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Telephonic hearing held on 7/28/2022. No defendants appeared on the hearing. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction as to certain defendants #36 is granted. Telephonic hearing set for 9/19/2022 at 9:15 a.m. The Clerk is directed to unseal Schedule A to the complaint #2 , Exhibit 5 and 6 to the Declaration of Nicolas Lambert #18 #19 #20 and the TRO #25 . Greer, Burns, & Crain Ltd. is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/instructions.Members of the public and media may listen to these proceedings by dialing (888) 684-8852 and using the access code is 1503395. Counsel of record and other essential case participants will receive an email prior to the start of the telephone hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 07/28/2022)

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: GuiZhongShangMaoYouXianGongSi, haikouruzaoshangmaoyouxiangongsi, haikoutannuowangluokejiyouxiangongsi, hangzhou zhiyimaoyiyouxiangongsi, hanya, hanyakunbeimei, Hazy Sun, Hefei Cancuo Network Technology Co., HENGYUANYUAN, hexiuzhen's shop, Hiku jin m y moy yuxin gngs, hogoo, honghanzhidianzishangwushop, hongze shangmao1, huanglinfang, Insect-LLT, IUHOGE, JiaMaoBaiHuo, jianghangg, jinmayi store, JiuBen, JiXiangDianZi, Jucise store, JUNBOOO, juxiangyidian, juxinhe, KATUI, KISMPA-YT, kunmingkongtishangmaoyouxiangongsi, Kyaliece, lcymeiguo, lianzu, LINGWUSHIDINGDINGBAIHUODIAN, LINGWUSHIQINGZHENGBAIHUODIAN, liuruibm, Lucky Little Cutie Store, Luxrmoon, LV U inch shop, lvliangxingchengmaoyiyouxiangongsi, LZ-ART, ManYiHaoWu, Mei Home, MEISHENG HUANG, mengzhichen, MiGa LLC, MikesImp, Movefad, Mumobe, Nasdaqs, NO.1 ART, ouxier E commerce, pendant Store, Povjiok, QIANQIANDAMAI, qianshenghaibang, qingwenge, qiuhualongdedain, quanfudian, QXYOUNG, ri zhao xue xin ban gong yong pin fu wu you xian g, ruitianmaoyiyouxiangongsi, Salim Group, Samuel shop, sbjk9lpvch, SDUVIHIU, Sean Lo, shandongshengjin, shangjiafang, Shengxi fa, shufangjumaoyishanghang, sikeda, Silan shop, Snow scene, Snow scene 2, steel Roses, Straw Handbag, Sur-Ciel, suzhoushicunangwangluokejiyouxiangongsi, SXJ-US SHOP, Szyking, TangNewShop, TosCLlsm Jewelry, UOUA, US-9SSD3Q, Uyoudgnahz, wedscareshop, william-store, WJBM, Wonderful purchase, Wulanlan, xianxingkepengshangmaoyouxiangongsi, xiaofu-store, xiaoxiansheng-store, YaDing, yangshuiling, Yarah, yingyukemao, yinjiashop, yiwushixiangchendianzishan, Your beauty is ever-changing, YOYUISO, yrin, YTT-01, YTXYZ, YUKOKAA, YYJHT, ZFDSR, ZHANGMINGZENG, zhangzixuann, ZhengzhouDuangeShangmaoYouxianGongsi, Zhuxiaobo-us, Zi Mu Xi, prado888 Store and Asge added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/28/2022. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Telephonic hearing held on 7/28/2022. No defendants appeared on the hearing. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction as to certain defendants #36 is granted. Telephonic hearing set for 9/19/2022 at 9:15 a.m. The Clerk is directed to unseal Schedule A to the complaint #2 , Exhibit 5 and 6 to the Declaration of Nicolas Lambert #18 #19 #20 and the TRO #25 . Greer, Burns, & Crain Ltd. is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/instructions.Members of the public and media may listen to these proceedings by dialing (888) 684-8852 and using the access code is 1503395. Counsel of record and other essential case participants will receive an email prior to the start of the telephone hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kasey L. Ewald, #2 Exhibit A)(Ewald, Kasey) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MEMORANDUM by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #36 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allyson M. Martin, #2 Exhibit 1)(Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION by Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. for preliminary injunction as to Certain Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Abr ligat, AC ACE, ADSFJK24017, Arkax XF, Barampes, Blumsmother, blvckmarket.net, bn2gfhg6, Bronzeriddle, buy-bags.shop, Casinos heide, creamhood.com, Eclafatico, Europocentric, everyfactory, Farnker, firstbags.ru, Flustmai, Gareth_ng, Goouder, Gran chechita, hanyanlei4665, Hiper Bebe & Grandecitos INC, Hispani, Homerum, honeyfruits, hotladyluxuryboutique.com, Jacquelyn C Hayden, jordanks.com, Judy W Campbell, kaiabags.com, kaialuxury.com, Karsmotors, kete0412, Kevin M Lopez, Legatro, lifanjun11270, lihongmei0567, lirenyuian668, liruonan24208, litao0959, liubin5401, liuchenxiang9531, llfff108, luxanes.com, luxury.jewelry1688, luxury_ke002, luxury_market_kids, luxuryshop2288, main sailim paint, Martin A Hogg, Masica, mitiendialove, mntia.com, Murphy Beauty Salon, Ndenomicx, Nultuds, Orderchep, PIANO KEY, quetp.com, Qupid, Raufelon, Rominaz, Ryan R Camire, Sacando, Sawell Mcnyland, ShopDeviouscom, show7a.com, songwenli05027, Sostermop, tangchangfeng56912, topluxbags.com, ToTongh, Trazo Jerard, trentinall.com, Trevor_Lois, TwoBaby13, Uwdoul, wangpeng9, wangxiang1754, wangxin0694, weiping2134, Wexufret Brill, wholesaler.imachinese, William A Hammontree, Wimoster, worldhealingtv, wwesst, xerbag.com, yakicks.com, yangtianhao54807, yangyuanzhao81846, yaofeng0983, ZamiraPon, zhangweitao2485, zhaopeng44524, zhoujiawei76863, zhouyijing668, zhumengna668 and zouyulan668 added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. by Kasey Leigh Ewald (Ewald, Kasey) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture, S.A. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Christian Dior Couture, S.A.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19603772. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less