This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:21:38 (UTC).

Christenson v. Christenson

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Christenson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Christenson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen McMahon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11552

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen McMahon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark C. Christenson

Seattle, WA 98125

Defendant

Rufus Christenson

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Rufus Christenson. Document filed by Mark C. Christenson.(rdz) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that under the June 20, 2018 order in Christenson v. Roe, ECF 1: 18-CV-3319, 3 (S.D.N.Y. June 20, 2018), the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Courts judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/18/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER OF DISMISSAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1651. Plaintiff files this new pro se case, but he does not seek leave to proceed IFP nor does he pay the filing fees. The Court assumes for the purpose of this order that he seeks to proceed IFP. Because Plaintiff has not sought leave of the Court to file, this action is dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the June 20, 2018 order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/18/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceived returned mail re: #3 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), #2 Order of Dismissal. Mail was addressed to Mark C. Christenson, 11313 19th Ave. NE, Seattle, WA 98125 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return to Sender Attempted - Not Known Unable to Forward. (vn) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #3 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), #2 Order of Dismissal, Notice of Appeal Forms, to Mark C. Christenson 11313 19th Ave. NE Seattle, WA 98125. (vba) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that under the June 20, 2018 order in Christenson v. Roe, ECF 1: 18-CV-3319, 3 (S.D.N.Y. June 20, 2018), the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Courts judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/18/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER OF DISMISSAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1651. Plaintiff files this new pro se case, but he does not seek leave to proceed IFP nor does he pay the filing fees. The Court assumes for the purpose of this order that he seeks to proceed IFP. Because Plaintiff has not sought leave of the Court to file, this action is dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the June 20, 2018 order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/18/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Rufus Christenson. Document filed by Mark C. Christenson.(rdz) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.