This case was last updated from PACER on 08/21/2020 at 12:29:44 (UTC).

Christensen v. USA

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 Christensen filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Deborah M Fine (PS), David G Campbell and Deborah M Fine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-08152

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David G Campbell

Referral Judges

Deborah M Fine (PS)

Deborah M Fine

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gary Steven Christensen

Flagstaff, AZ 86001

Respondent

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

James Richard Knapp

Attorney at US Attorneys Office - Phoenix, AZ

2 Renaissance Square, 40 N Central Ave., Ste. 1800

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4408

Lori Lynne Price

Attorney at US Attorneys Office - Tucson, AZ

405 W Congress St., Ste. 4800

Tucson, AZ 85701-4050

Mary Bridget Minder

Attorney at US Attorneys Office - Phoenix, AZ

2 Renaissance Square, 40 N Central Ave., Ste. 1800

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4408

Peter S Sexton

Attorney at US Attorneys Office - Phoenix, AZ

2 Renaissance Square, 40 N Central Ave., Ste. 1800

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4408

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Petition for Writ of Error Coram Nobis and #2 Motion to Stay Garnishment by Petitioner Gary Steven Christensen. (MSA) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#16

(#16) ORDER: Movant must file a Reply to the United States' Response within ten days of the filing date of this Order. Failure to file a reply in accordance with this Order may be deemed as consent to the denial of the request for an extension of time to respond to the pending garnishments. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/10/20. (GMP) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#15

(#15) *NOTICE of Service by Mail of Government's Response to the Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to the Pending Garnishments (Doc. #14 ) by USA . (Price, Lori) *Modified text on 8/6/2020 (SLQ). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#14

(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Clarification of Court's Order re: #9 Service Order (2255) Response to Defendant's Request to Extend Time to Respond to Garnishments filed by USA. (Price, Lori) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER - (1) The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Movant's Application for Entry of Default Against United States of America (Doc. #7 ) and Motion for Clarification (Doc. #12 ). (2) Movant's Application for Entry of Default Against United States of America (Doc. #7 ) is denied. (3) Movant's Motion for Clarification (Doc. #12 ) is granted to the extent this Order clarifies the July 16, 2020 Order as explained herein. (4) The United States must respond within 5 days of this Order to Movant's request for an extension of time to respond to the pending garnishments. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 7/30/2020. (LAD) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Clarification of Court's Order re: #9 Service Order (2255) by Gary Steven Christensen. (3 pages) (KFZ) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Correct Address by Gary Steven Christensen. (LAD) (2 pages. Note: This is the same address currently on the docket, 5150 N Schultz Pass Road). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#10

(#10) REPLY to Government's Response to #7 Application for Entry of Default by Petitioner Gary Steven Christensen. (LAD) (3 pages) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

9 #1

petition

#9

(#9) Service Order - The Clerk of Court must electronically serve a copy of the #1 Petition for Writ of Error Coram Nobis and this Order on the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona pursuant to Rule 4, Rules Governing Section 2255 Cases, and the Memorandum of Understanding between the United States District Clerk of Court for the District of Arizona and the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Arizona. Dr. Christensen's #2 Motion to Stay is denied. The matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. See document for further details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 7/16/20. (Attachments: #1 petition)(GMP) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE re: #7 Application for Entry of Default by Respondent USA. (Minder, Mary) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#7

(#7) APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Petitioner Gary Steven Christensen against USA. (LAD) (5 pages) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#6

(#6) REPLY to #5 Response to #2 MOTION to Stay filed by Gary Steven Christensen. (LAD) (3 pages) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#5

(#5) RESPONSE in Opposition re: #2 MOTION to Stay filed by USA. (Price, Lori) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#2

(#2) MOTION to Stay All Restitution Payments and All Garnishment Proceedings by Gary Steven Christensen. (filed pro se 3 pages and 1 page order) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BAS) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

1 #1

envelope

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Error Coram Nobis re: Criminal Case No CR14-8164-PCT-DGC filed by Gary Steven Christensen (submitted pro se 18 pages plus envelope). (Attachments: #1 envelope)(BAS) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Petition for Writ of Error Coram Nobis and #2 Motion to Stay Garnishment by Petitioner Gary Steven Christensen. (MSA) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: Movant must file a Reply to the United States' Response within ten days of the filing date of this Order. Failure to file a reply in accordance with this Order may be deemed as consent to the denial of the request for an extension of time to respond to the pending garnishments. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/10/20. (GMP) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) *NOTICE of Service by Mail of Government's Response to the Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to the Pending Garnishments (Doc. #14 ) by USA . (Price, Lori) *Modified text on 8/6/2020 (SLQ). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Clarification of Court's Order re: #9 Service Order (2255) Response to Defendant's Request to Extend Time to Respond to Garnishments filed by USA. (Price, Lori) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER - (1) The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Movant's Application for Entry of Default Against United States of America (Doc. #7 ) and Motion for Clarification (Doc. #12 ). (2) Movant's Application for Entry of Default Against United States of America (Doc. #7 ) is denied. (3) Movant's Motion for Clarification (Doc. #12 ) is granted to the extent this Order clarifies the July 16, 2020 Order as explained herein. (4) The United States must respond within 5 days of this Order to Movant's request for an extension of time to respond to the pending garnishments. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 7/30/2020. (LAD) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Clarification of Court's Order re: #9 Service Order (2255) by Gary Steven Christensen. (3 pages) (KFZ) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Correct Address by Gary Steven Christensen. (LAD) (2 pages. Note: This is the same address currently on the docket, 5150 N Schultz Pass Road). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY to Government's Response to #7 Application for Entry of Default by Petitioner Gary Steven Christensen. (LAD) (3 pages) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Service Order - The Clerk of Court must electronically serve a copy of the #1 Petition for Writ of Error Coram Nobis and this Order on the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona pursuant to Rule 4, Rules Governing Section 2255 Cases, and the Memorandum of Understanding between the United States District Clerk of Court for the District of Arizona and the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Arizona. Dr. Christensen's #2 Motion to Stay is denied. The matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. See document for further details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 7/16/20. (Attachments: #1 petition)(GMP) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE re: #7 Application for Entry of Default by Respondent USA. (Minder, Mary) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Petitioner Gary Steven Christensen against USA. (LAD) (5 pages) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPLY to #5 Response to #2 MOTION to Stay filed by Gary Steven Christensen. (LAD) (3 pages) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE in Opposition re: #2 MOTION to Stay filed by USA. (Price, Lori) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. (BAS) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Stay All Restitution Payments and All Garnishment Proceedings by Gary Steven Christensen. (filed pro se 3 pages and 1 page order) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BAS) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Error Coram Nobis re: Criminal Case No CR14-8164-PCT-DGC filed by Gary Steven Christensen (submitted pro se 18 pages plus envelope). (Attachments: #1 envelope)(BAS) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less