Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/29/2020 at 08:15:44 (UTC).

Christensen et al v. Walmart Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 Christensen filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Jon Phipps McCalla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02893

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Jon Phipps McCalla

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Paulette Christensen

Paige Stewart

Defendants

Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC

Walmart Inc.

Acme Furniture Industry, Inc.

Zinus, Inc

Not Classified By Court

Temiika Gipson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan Saharovich

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON PLLC

130 N. Ct. Ave

Memphis, TN 38103

Les Jones

Attorney at Burch Porter & Johnson, PLLC

130 North Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorneys

George Andrew Rowlett

Attorney at HOWELL & FISHER, PLLC

3310 West End Avenue, Ste 550

Nashville, TN 37203

Stephen W. Elliott

Attorney at HOWELL & FISHER

300 James Robertson Pkwy

Nashville, TN 37201-1107

Jonathan T. Martin

Attorney at HARRIS SHELTON HANOVER WALSH, PLLC - East Memphis

6060 Primacy Parkway, Suite 100

Memphis, TN 38119

Gary H. Nichols

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GARY H. NICHOLS

1050 Crown Pointe Parkway, Suite 550-A

Atlanta, GA 30328

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER granting #22 Motion to Substitute Attorney.. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 2/26/20. (aac) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#22

(#22) MOTION to Substitute Attorney Proposed Order Submitted by Zinus, Inc. (Martin, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

#21

(#21) Proposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Proposed Order Submitted by Zinus, Inc. (Martin, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#20

(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/24/20. (aac) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#19

(#19) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial is set for Monday, 1/4/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 12/18/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 on 12/11/2020. (jrs) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#17

(#17) RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Zinus, Inc. by Zinus, Inc.(Nichols, Gary) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#16

(#16) Alias Summons Issued as to Acme Furniture Industry, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#15

(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zinus, Inc. (Nichols, Gary) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary H. Nichols on behalf of Zinus, Inc (Nichols, Gary) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. Elliott on behalf of Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#8

(#8) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Friday, 1/24/2020 at 10:45 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Please follow the instructions on the Notice of Setting to gain access to the telephonic hearing. (jrs) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#4

(#4) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC. (Rowlett, George) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Rowlett, George) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit B-Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit A-Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc. from Circuit Court for Shelby County, case number CT-4457-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3248254), filed by Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Summons, #3 Exhibit B-Complaint)(Rowlett, George) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #22 Motion to Substitute Attorney.. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 2/26/20. (aac) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Substitute Attorney Proposed Order Submitted by Zinus, Inc. (Martin, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Proposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Proposed Order Submitted by Zinus, Inc. (Martin, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/24/20. (aac) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial is set for Monday, 1/4/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 12/18/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 on 12/11/2020. (jrs) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#18) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/24/2020. Les Jones and Ryan Saharovich appeared for the Plaintiff. -- Stephen W. Elliott and Gary H. Nichols appeared for the Defendants. Amended Complaint to be filed by 1/27/2020. Inclusion of apartment complex as named party will affect diversity status. Jury Trial is set for Monday, 1/4/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for 12/18/2020 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 12/11/2020. (Court Reporter: Karla Seely, Alpha Reporting) (jrs) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Zinus, Inc. by Zinus, Inc.(Nichols, Gary) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Alias Summons Issued as to Acme Furniture Industry, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zinus, Inc. (Nichols, Gary) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary H. Nichols on behalf of Zinus, Inc (Nichols, Gary) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc..(Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. Elliott on behalf of Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Friday, 1/24/2020 at 10:45 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Please follow the instructions on the Notice of Setting to gain access to the telephonic hearing. (jrs) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC. (Rowlett, George) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Rowlett, George) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc. from Circuit Court for Shelby County, case number CT-4457-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3248254), filed by Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Summons, #3 Exhibit B-Complaint)(Rowlett, George) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zinus, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ACME FURNITURE INDUSTRY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart is a litigant