This case was last updated from PACER on 09/01/2019 at 07:50:53 (UTC).

Christensen et al v. Dunn et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 Christensen filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Dunn. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L. Viken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05046

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey L. Viken

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William J. Bom

Rapid City, SD 57701

Marianne Karl-Christensen

Rapid City, SD 57703

Paula Michelle Christensen

Rapid City, SD 57701

Defendants

NWE Management Company

Kelly Dunn

Meadowlark Hill Mobile Park Estates

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Eric J. Pickar

Attorney at Bangs McCullen Law Firm

333 West Boulevard, Suite 400, Po Box 2670, 343-1040

Rapid City, SD 57701

Terry G. Westergaard

Attorney at Bangs, McCullen, Butler, Foye & Simmons

Po Box 2670, 343-1040, Fax: 343-1503

Rapid City, SD 57709

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Letter from Paula M. Christensen

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS filed by All Defendants. (Pickar, Eric) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

5 #2

2nd Letter from Paula M. Christensen

#6

(#6) LETTER Received from Paula M. Christensen to State Court Judge. (SKK) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#11

(#11) LETTER Received from Paula M. Christensen containing Certified Letter Receipts. (SRA) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Paula Michelle Christensen. (JLS) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, ($400 fee paid, receipt# SDX500005910) filed by Paula Michelle Christensen, William J. Bom, Marianne Karl-Christensen. (Attachments: #1 Attachments to Complaint) (JLS) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

1 #1

Attachments to Complaint

#10

(#10) LETTER Received from Paula M. Christensen to Peg Perreault, Evironmental Protection Agency Project Officer for Region 8. (SRA) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 3 Summmonses, a Rule 73 Memo, a copy of Fed.R.Civ.P.4, and 4 AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery. (Fed.R.Civ.P.4 being mailed to each Plaintiff with AO85) (JLS) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#12

(#12) LETTER Received from Paula M. Christensen to DRSD. (SRA) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE as to Kelly Dunn, Meadowlark Hill Mobile Park Estates, NWE Management Company served on 7/3/19. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Paula M. Christensen, #2 2nd Letter from Paula M. Christensen)(SKK) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to DISMISS by Kelly Dunn, Meadowlark Hill Mobile Park Estates, NWE Management Company. (Pickar, Eric) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Terry G. Westergaard on behalf of All Defendants. (Westergaard, Terry) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) LETTER Received from Paula M. Christensen to DRSD. (SRA) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) LETTER Received from Paula M. Christensen containing Certified Letter Receipts. (SRA) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) LETTER Received from Paula M. Christensen to Peg Perreault, Evironmental Protection Agency Project Officer for Region 8. (SRA) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Terry G. Westergaard on behalf of All Defendants. (Westergaard, Terry) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS filed by All Defendants. (Pickar, Eric) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to DISMISS by Kelly Dunn, Meadowlark Hill Mobile Park Estates, NWE Management Company. (Pickar, Eric) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER Received from Paula M. Christensen to State Court Judge. (SKK) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN OF SERVICE as to Kelly Dunn, Meadowlark Hill Mobile Park Estates, NWE Management Company served on 7/3/19. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Paula M. Christensen, #2 2nd Letter from Paula M. Christensen)(SKK) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with the filing fee and completed summons(es). A new case has been opened. Your summmonses were issued. You are responsible for arranging service of the summons(es) and complaint on the defendant(s). If you are interested in receiving electronic notice of documents filed in your case and/or electronically filing documents in your case, complete and return the enclosed CM/ECF Pro Se Litigation Application Form. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (JLS) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 3 Summmonses, a Rule 73 Memo, a copy of Fed.R.Civ.P.4, and 4 AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery. (Fed.R.Civ.P.4 being mailed to each Plaintiff with AO85) (JLS) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Paula Michelle Christensen. (JLS) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, ($400 fee paid, receipt# SDX500005910) filed by Paula Michelle Christensen, William J. Bom, Marianne Karl-Christensen. (Attachments: #1 Attachments to Complaint) (JLS) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.