This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/03/2023 at 06:43:03 (UTC).

Christensen et al v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2023 Christensen filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David G Estudillo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-05255

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David G Estudillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Emmett Christensen

Defendants

3M Company

ITT LLC

Paramount Global

Redco Corporation

Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Anchor/Darling Valve Company

88 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin H Adams

Dylan J Johnson

Alexandra B Caggiano

Brian Weinstein

Tyson B Gamble

Defendant Attorneys

Nancy M Erfle

Mark B Tuvim

Kevin J Craig

Trevor J. Mohr

Other Attorneys

Jeanne F Loftis

Melissa K Roeder

Erin P Fraser

Jean Y Kang

Rachel Tallon Reynolds

Rachel A Rubin

J. Scott Wood

Virginia Leeper

45 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#175

(#175) ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #110 Motion to Remand. Per LCR 3(i), this case will be remanded to Pierce County Superior Court on the 15th day following the date of this Order, on 9/13/2023. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo. (ZMG) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

#174

(#174) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC ONLY by Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC (Loftis, Jeanne) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

#173

(#173) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND re #110 MOTION to Remand ; filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gamble, Tyson) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

#172

(#172) NOTICE to Withdraw re #117 Response to Motion ; filed by Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC. (Loftis, Jeanne) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

#171

(#171) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, by BW/IP Inc.(Rubin, Rachel) (Entered: 08/18/2023)

117 #1

Proposed Order

#117

(#172) NOTICE to Withdraw re #117 Response to Motion ; filed by Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC. (Loftis, Jeanne) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

110 #1

Proposed Order

#110

(#173) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND re #110 MOTION to Remand ; filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gamble, Tyson) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Eversole, Sarah) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah L Eversole on behalf of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Eversole, Sarah) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney G William Shaw on behalf of Defendant Redco Corporation. (Shaw, G) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Velan Valve Corp. (Tuvim, Mark) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Tuvim, Mark) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Jury Demand Attachment B

1 #1

Complaint Attachment A

#1

(#171) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, by BW/IP Inc.(Rubin, Rachel) (Entered: 08/18/2023)

189 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#175) ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #110 Motion to Remand. Per LCR 3(i), this case will be remanded to Pierce County Superior Court on the 15th day following the date of this Order, on 9/13/2023. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo. (ZMG) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#174) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC ONLY by Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC (Loftis, Jeanne) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#173) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND re #110 MOTION to Remand ; filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gamble, Tyson) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#172) NOTICE to Withdraw re #117 Response to Motion ; filed by Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC. (Loftis, Jeanne) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#171) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, by BW/IP Inc.(Rubin, Rachel) (Entered: 08/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#170) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney W Greg Lockwood on behalf of Defendant 3M Company. (Lockwood, W) (Entered: 08/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#169) MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES - *TWENTY DAY* Jury Trial is set for 9/3/2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom B before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. Joinder of Parties due by 8/21/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2023, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/26/2024, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 3/27/2024, Motions due by 4/1/2024, Discovery completed by 4/8/2024, Dispositive motions due by 5/5/2024, Motions in Limine due by 7/29/2024, Pretrial Order due by 8/12/2024, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 8/13/2024, Agreed Neutral Statement of the Case due by 8/13/2024, Deposition Designations due by 8/13/2024, Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2024 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom B. (MGC) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • Docket(#168) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo- Dep Clerk: Gretchen Craft; Pla Counsel: Alex Caggiano, Tyson Gamble; Def Counsel: Penn Gheen, Bill Shaw, Cassandra Ekure, Justin Meyer, Lindsey March, Lorianne Hanson, Michael Ricketts, Nancy Erfle, Per Jansen, Rachel Reynolds, Rachel Rubin, Shaun Morgan; CR: Sheri Schelbert; Time of Hearing: 2:00; Courtroom: Zoom; Scheduling Conference held on 7/21/2023. Court outlines expectations of parties re professionalism, rules and deadlines. Trial is set for 9/3/2024; scheduling order to issue. (MGC) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#167) NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Justin Leslie Meyer on behalf of Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC. (Meyer, Justin) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#166) NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Valves and Controls US Inc (Kopij, Dana Uhle, Megan) Modified on 7/21/2023 (AMD). (Entered: 07/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
164 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Benjamin Adams FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7947959 (Weinstein, Brian) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint; by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Eversole, Sarah) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Eversole, Sarah) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah L Eversole on behalf of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Eversole, Sarah) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney G William Shaw on behalf of Defendant Redco Corporation. (Shaw, G) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Velan Valve Corp. (Tuvim, Mark) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Tuvim, Mark) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketNOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), all Defendants must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4/4/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(MW) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketU.S. District Judge David G Estudillo added. (MW) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court JURY DEMAND by Plaintiff attached as separate document; from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 23-2-04965-4; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7944907) filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Attachment A, #2 Jury Demand Attachment B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Loftis, Jeanne) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less