This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2021 at 11:04:00 (UTC).

Kalb v. Gardaworld Cashlink LLC

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 Kalb filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Gardaworld Cashlink LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jonathan E. Hawley and Joe Billy McDade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01092

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jonathan E. Hawley

Presiding Judge

Joe Billy McDade

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kalb Chris

Chris Kalb

Defendant

Gardaworld Cashlink LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carl Vincent Malmstrom

Attorney at WOLF HALDENSTEIN ADLER FREEMAN & HERZ LLC

Suite 1700, 111 W Jackson Blvd

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Phillip M Schreiber

Attorney at HOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP

27Th Floor, 150 N. Riverside

Chicago, IL 60606

Mark L Shapiro

Attorney at HOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP

27Th Floor, 150 N. Riverside

Chicago, IL 60606

Kelly D DeWitt

Attorney at HOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP

27Th Floor, 150 N. Riverside

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Chris Kalb Class Action

1 #2

Exhibit A-1 Kalb Motion for Class Certification

1 #3

Exhibit Declaration of Parisi

1 #4

Exhibit Declaration of Schiavino

#2

#3

#4

#5

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 4/28/2021. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to sever and partially remand (doc. 10) is DENIED. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (doc. 5) and Motion to Stay (doc. 7) within twenty-one (21) days. See full written Order.(VH) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand (Severance and Partial Remand) Defendant's Opposition filed by Defendant Gardaworld Cashlink LLC. (Schreiber, Phillip) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand (Severance and Partial Remand) by Plaintiff Kalb Chris. Responses due by 4/29/2021 (Malmstrom, Carl) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mark L Shapiro on behalf of Gardaworld Cashlink LLC (Shapiro, Mark) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 3/24/2021. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c), Plaintiff has 30 days from the date of removal to file a motion to remand. The Court will therefore suspend the briefing schedule on the pending Motions--the Motion for Class Certification [1-2], Motion to Dismiss #5 , and Motion to Stay Proceedings as to Certain Defense #7 --until any motion to remand is resolved or Plaintiff files a notice stating he does not intend to file a motion to remand. Upon the occurrence of either scenario, the Court will reset the deadlines to respond. (EWL) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kelly D DeWitt on behalf of Gardaworld Cashlink LLC (DeWitt, Kelly) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Stay Proceedings as to Certain Defenses by Defendant Gardaworld Cashlink LLC. Responses due by 4/7/2021 (Schreiber, Phillip) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Gardaworld Cashlink LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit Parisi Declaration)(Schreiber, Phillip) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Gardaworld Cashlink LLC. Responses due by 4/7/2021 (Schreiber, Phillip) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Gardaworld Cashlink LLC. (Schreiber, Phillip) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Phillip M Schreiber on behalf of Gardaworld Cashlink LLC (Schreiber, Phillip) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Carl Vincent Malmstrom on behalf of Kalb Chris (Malmstrom, Carl) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of McLean County, 11th Judicial Circuit, Illinois, case number 2021L0000014 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3613640), filed by Gardaworld Cashlink LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chris Kalb Class Action, #2 Exhibit A-1 Kalb Motion for Class Certification, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Parisi, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Schiavino)(Schreiber, Phillip) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARDAWORLD CASHLINK LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carl Vincent Malmstrom