This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2020 at 21:16:05 (UTC).

Chris Langer v. Kalnel Gardens, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 Chris Langer filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Kalnel Gardens, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jean P. Rosenbluth and George H. Wu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04806

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chris Langer

Defendants

Kalnel Gardens, LLC

Does 1-10

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider

John K Mitchell

Long Beach, CA 90802

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Phyl Grace

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Johnna Jane Hansen

Attorney at Law Offices of Johnna Hansen

12405 Venice Boulevard Suite 394

Los Angeles, CA 90066

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider Attorney

John Kevin Mitchell

Attorney at Law Offices of John K Mitchell

400 Oceangate 8Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

#39

#38

#37

#36

#35

31 #1

Declaration Proof of Service

#31

26 #1

Proof of Service

#26

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Settlement is not reached, however, discussions are ongoing. The Court continues the status conference to August 27, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are to file a one-page joint status report by August 24, 2020. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dennis Jay Price, II counsel for Plaintiff Chris Langer. Phyl Grace is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Price, Dennis) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) John K Mitchell has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that John Mitchell may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer(Montgomery, Elliott) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. The Court has reviewed the paities' Joint Rule 26(f) Repo1t (Docket No. #26 ) and finds it can set the schedule in this matter without hearing fmther statements from the pa1ties. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the April 30, 2020 status conference date is taken off calendar. The Court sets the following dates. See minute order for dates / deadlines. (lom) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Change of Attorney Business Contact Information. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #29 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Title page is missing. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): The image attached to docket entry #29 is a proof of service. Proof of service is missing a title page. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) DECLARATION of Johnna Hansen Form G-06 Attorney Information Change filed by Defendant Kalnel Gardens, LLC. (Hansen, Johnna) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Proof of Service)(Hansen, Johnna) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Kalnel Gardens, LLC.(Hansen, Johnna) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Kalnel Gardens, LLC served on 8/11/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane(Doe)-In Charge of office at time of service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Change of address by Russell C Handy attorney for Plaintiff Chris Langer. Changing attorneys address to 8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200, San Diego, CA 92111. Filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kalnel Gardens, LLC. (car) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Chris Langer, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23843105 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Chris Langer(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KALNEL GARDENS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Kevin Mitchell