This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2020 at 08:23:32 (UTC).

Chris Langer v. Chinese 6 Theatres, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Chris Langer filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Chinese 6 Theatres, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alka Sagar and Dale S. Fischer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-07975

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chris Langer

Defendants

Does 1-10

Chinese 6 Theatres, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Chinese 6 Theatres, LLC served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hinah Doe - Person Authorized to accept / Director of Operations in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Chinese 6 Theatres, LLC. (jp) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#8

(#8) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (rfi) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jp) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27872684 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Chris Langer(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Chinese 6 Theatres, LLC served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hinah Doe - Person Authorized to accept / Director of Operations in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Chinese 6 Theatres, LLC. (jp) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (rfi) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jp) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27872684 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Chris Langer(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHINESE THEATRE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis Jay Price, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Clive Handy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Lockhart Seabock