This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2023 at 09:34:43 (UTC).

CHR Holding Corp v. Scottsdale Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 CHR Holding Corp filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Scottsdale Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jay C. Zainey and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-05436

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay C. Zainey

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHR Holding Corp

Defendant

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael D Lane

Attorney at Lane Law Group LLC

900 Camp Street, Suite 4C4

New Orleans, LA 70448

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Emerson Hanna

Attorney at Mouledoux Bland Legrand & Brackett LLC

701 Poydras Street, Ste 600

New Orleans, LA 70139

Kathryn Lynn Briuglio

Attorney at Mouledoux, Bland, Legrand & Brackett

701 Poydras St., Suite 600

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court Orleans Parish, case number 22-9993 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9716133) filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Notice of Appearance, #5 Certificate of Filing, #6 CDC Notice of Removal, #7 Verification, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Mark Emerson Hanna added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Hanna, Mark) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Notice of Appearance

1 #5

Certificate of Filing

1 #6

CDC Notice of Removal

1 #7

Verification

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(js) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Hanna, Mark) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Compliance Response to Court's 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) Directive by Scottsdale Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Hanna, Mark) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Compliance Response to Court's 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) Directive by Scottsdale Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Hanna, Mark) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Hanna, Mark) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(js) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (mb) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court Orleans Parish, case number 22-9993 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9716133) filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Notice of Appearance, #5 Certificate of Filing, #6 CDC Notice of Removal, #7 Verification, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Mark Emerson Hanna added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Hanna, Mark) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less