This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/03/2023 at 10:24:51 (UTC).

Chowdhury v. Mayorkas et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 Chowdhury filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Mayorkas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Reed C. O'Connor. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:22-CV-00115

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reed C. O'Connor

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EBRAHIM CHOWDHURY

Respondents

Alejandro Mayorkas

Ur M Jaddou

Merrick B Garland

Ted H Kim

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Brian Jacob Kholodovsky, I

Respondent Attorney

Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Merrick B Garland, Ur M Jaddou, Ted H Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#14

(#14) Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ added as AUSA. (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#13

(#13) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (No magistrate judge assigned). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tjc) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

12 #1

*Restricted*

12 #12

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#11

(#11) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 8/29/2022; TED H. KIM served on 8/29/2022; ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 8/29/2022 (Kholodovsky, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#10

(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/24/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/23/2022. (Kholodovsky, Brian); Modified to correct date of service and answer deadline on 10/28/2022 (ztth). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#9

(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/29/2022. (Kholodovsky, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 10/25/2022)

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 #10

INDEX OF EXHIBITS

1 #9

Summons SUMMONS FOR TED H. KIM

1 #8

Summons SUMMONS FOR UR M. JADDOU

1 #7

Summons SUMMONS FOR ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS

1 #6

Summons SUMMONS FOR ATTORNEY GENERAL

1 #5

Summons SUMMONS FOR U.S. ATTORNEY

1 #4

Exhibit EXHIBIT D

1 #3

Exhibit EXHIBIT C

1 #1

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (tjc) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Merrick B Garland, Ur M Jaddou, Ted H Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ added as AUSA. (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (No magistrate judge assigned). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tjc) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Case electronically transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:22-cv-01766. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/23/2022, (ztth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 8/29/2022; TED H. KIM served on 8/29/2022; ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 8/29/2022 (Kholodovsky, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/24/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/23/2022. (Kholodovsky, Brian); Modified to correct date of service and answer deadline on 10/28/2022 (ztth). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/29/2022. (Kholodovsky, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 11/3/2022. (dot) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Time to effectuate service upon party due by 10/23/2022. (dot) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER regarding service of process. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 3, 2022. (lcckk1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/18/2022. (DM) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, TED H. KIM, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmh) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET by EBRAHIM CHOWDHURY filed by EBRAHIM CHOWDHURY.(Kholodovsky, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE with Corrected Civil Cover Sheet filed by EBRAHIM CHOWDHURY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Corrected Civil Cover sheet)(Kholodovsky, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. The plaintiff was notified of errors in his #1 Complaint on June 22, 2022. Yet the plaintiff has not corrected the errors and has not sought leave for an extension of time to do so. The Court hereby ORDERS that the plaintiff shall, on or before July 6, 2022, SHOW CAUSE as to why the case should not be dismissed for failure to follow the Local Rules. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 29, 2022. (lcdlf1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to brian@jeelani-law.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Signature on civil cover sheet does not match filing attorney. Please file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, TED H. KIM, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9318129) filed by MD EBRAHIM CHOWDHURY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #5 Summons SUMMONS FOR U.S. ATTORNEY, #6 Summons SUMMONS FOR ATTORNEY GENERAL, #7 Summons SUMMONS FOR ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, #8 Summons SUMMONS FOR UR M. JADDOU, #9 Summons SUMMONS FOR TED H. KIM, #10 INDEX OF EXHIBITS, #11 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET)(Kholodovsky, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.] (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less