This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:27:06 (UTC).

Chorba v. Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Chorba filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Northern Leasing Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen M. Williams and Alicia O. Valle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-60452

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Williams

Referral Judge

Alicia O. Valle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stephen L Chorba

Stephen L. Chorba

Defendant

Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Etan Mark

Attorney at Mark Migdal & Hayden

80 Sw 8Th Street, Suite 1999

Miami, FL 33130

Joshua Adam Migdal

Attorney at Mark, Migdal & Hayden

80 Sw 8Th Street, Suite 1999

Miami, FL 33130

George Thomas Breur

Attorney at Mark, Migdal & Hayden LLC

1999, 80 Sw 8Th St.

Miami, FL 33130

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel P. Dietrich

Attorney at Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, P.A

401 E. Jackson Street, Suite 2500

Tampa, FL 33602

Scott E. Silberfein

Attorney at Moses & Singer LLP

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10174

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Northern Leasing Systems, Inc. Notice of filing Civil Cover Sheet (Dietrich, Daniel) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#5

(#10) ORDER granting #5 Agreed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott E. Silberfein, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 2/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (lmk) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before March 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 2/27/2019. (dpa) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 2/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #5 Agreed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott E. Silberfein, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 2/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (lmk) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#30

(#30) RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Stephen L. Chorba. Replies due by 4/24/2019. (Breur, George) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#22

(#22) MOTION to Stay Discovery by Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 4/17/2019 (Dietrich, Daniel) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#28

(#28) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.. (Dietrich, Daniel) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#27

(#27) NOTICE by Northern Leasing Systems, Inc. Filing Redacted Version of Docket Entry Pursuant to Order Granting Motion to Seal Document (Dietrich, Daniel) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#24

(#24) Unopposed MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.. (Dietrich, Daniel) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#23

(#23) REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Sara Krieger in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue)(Dietrich, Daniel) Modified by Sealing [23-1] pursuant to 25 Paperless Order on 4/10/2019 (nc). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

23 #1

*Restricted*

21 #3

Exhibit C

21 #4

Exhibit D

#21

(#21) Plaintiff's RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue by Stephen L. Chorba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Breur, George) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

21 #2

Exhibit B

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Stephen L. Chorba. Replies due by 4/24/2019. (Breur, George) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time. The Motion is GRANTED for the time period requested. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/12/2019. (dpa) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.. (Dietrich, Daniel) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE by Northern Leasing Systems, Inc. Filing Redacted Version of Docket Entry Pursuant to Order Granting Motion to Seal Document (Dietrich, Daniel) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • (#26) CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Sealing [23-1] pursuant to 25 Paperless Order (nc) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 4/10/2019. (sd01) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Unopposed MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.. (Dietrich, Daniel) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Sara Krieger in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue)(Dietrich, Daniel) Modified by Sealing [23-1] pursuant to 25 Paperless Order on 4/10/2019 (nc). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION to Stay Discovery by Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 4/17/2019 (Dietrich, Daniel) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Plaintiff's RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue by Stephen L. Chorba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Breur, George) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #5 Agreed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott E. Silberfein, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 2/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (lmk) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 2/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before March 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 2/27/2019. (dpa) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to complaint . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint by Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 3/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dietrich, Daniel) Modified Relief on 2/26/2019 (ls). (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Agreed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Scott E. Silberfein. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11421123 by Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 3/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dietrich, Daniel) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Northern Leasing Systems, Inc. Notice of filing Civil Cover Sheet (Dietrich, Daniel) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 1 [cmp] restricted/sealed until further notice. (mc) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • (#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (kpe) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.