This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/28/2021 at 09:41:57 (UTC).

Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma v. Enable Midstream Partners, LP et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Enable Midstream Partners, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald A. White and Scott L. Palk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00190

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Ronald A. White

Scott L. Palk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma

Defendants

Zenergy, Inc.

Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC

Enable Midstream Partners, LP

Enogex, LLC

Enable GP, LLC

Zinke and Trumbo, Inc.

ABC Companies

Highland Partners Holdings, LLC

Hiland Partners Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Austin Vance

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway, Ste 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

J. Renley Dennis

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway, Ste 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Michael Burrage

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway, Ste 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Tom Q. Ferguson

Attorney at Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson (Tulsa)

Two W Second St, Ste 700

Tulsa, OK 74103-3117

Christopher M. Scaperlanda

Attorney at McAfee & Taft, PC (OKC)

211 N Robinson, 8Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

Michael D. McClintock

Attorney at McAfee & Taft, PC (OKC)

211 N Robinson, 8Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

Bradley W. Welsh

Attorney at GableGotwals - Tulsa

110 N Elgin, Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74120-1492

Tammy D. Barrett

Attorney at GableGotwals - Tulsa

110 N Elgin, Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74120-1492

Terry D. Ragsdale

Attorney at GableGotwals - Tulsa

110 N Elgin, Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74120-1492

 

Court Documents

#38

#37

29 #5

Exhibit 5 - Form 1003 Plugging Record

29 #4

Exhibit 4 - Form 1002A Completion Report

29 #3

Exhibit 3 - Form 1000 Application to Drill

29 #2

Exhibit 2 - 2020.11.18 Choctaw Letter to Zinke Trumbo

#29

#28

#27

#6

#5

#4

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - Pleadings

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

#2

#1

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #28 Second MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ) by Enable GP, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC ;(Scaperlanda, Christopher) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ) by Hiland Partners Holdings, LLC ;(Welsh, Bradley) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docket(#36) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of District Judge John F. Heil, III and at the direction of the Court, this case is hereby reassigned to United States Judge Scott L. Palk of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number 21-CV-190-SLP. (kdc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docket(#35) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of United States District Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge John F. Heil, III. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-21-190-JFH. (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting #29 Motion to Dismiss Party and dismissing Defendant Zenergy, Inc. (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #28 Second MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ) by Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma ;(Burrage, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ) by Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma ; (With attachments)(Burrage, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ) by Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma ; (With attachments)(Burrage, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: In light of the Amended Complaint filed on 7/23/2021 (Re: #23 Amended Complaint) Defendants' #16 #18 and #19 Motions to Dismiss Case are hereby deemed MOOT. (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION to Dismiss Party by Zenergy, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 8/13/2021(Ferguson, Tom) Modified on 8/16/2021 to edit text and event (tls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael D. McClintock on behalf of Enable GP, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC (McClintock, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher M. Scaperlanda on behalf of Enable GP, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC (Scaperlanda, Christopher) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zenergy, Inc. (Ferguson, Tom) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tom Q. Ferguson on behalf of Zenergy, Inc. (Ferguson, Tom) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Consent to Removal (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Zenergy, Inc. (Ferguson, Tom) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 6/30/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1523228 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Enable GP, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC (Scaperlanda, Christopher) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 7/7/2021)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Bryan County District Court, case number CJ-2021-075 by Enable GP, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Enable GP, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against ABC Companies, Enable GP, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC, Highland Partners Holdings, LLC, Zenergy, Inc. by Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHOCTAW NATION OF OKLAHOMA is a litigant

Latest cases where Enable Midstream Partners, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Burrage