This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/08/2020 at 08:53:11 (UTC).

Chisholm's-Village Plaza LLC v. Travelers Commercial Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Chisholm's-Village Plaza LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin R. Sweazea and Gregory J. Fouratt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00920

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kevin R. Sweazea

Presiding Judge

Gregory J. Fouratt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chisholm's-Village Plaza LLC

Defendants

The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Burke Insurance Group

Will Burke

Travelers Commercial Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas M. Hnasko

Attorney at Hinkle Hensley Shanor & Martin LLP

Po Box 2068

Santa Fe, NM 87504

Julie Sakura

Attorney at Hinkle Hensley Shanor & Martin LLP

218 Montezuma Ave.

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Dioscoro Blanco

Attorney at Hinkle Shanor LLP

218 Montezuma Ave.

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Defendant Attorneys

James G. Whitley

Attorney at James G Whitley, PC

679 East Second Avenue

Durango, CO 81301

Robert C. Evans

Attorney at Evans & Co.

823 E. 4Th Ave.

Durango, CO 81301

Jason J Irvin

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

500 Marquette Ave Nw, Suite 1200

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Daniel E Feinberg

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

One North Franklin, Ste 800

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#9

#10

#11

#12

#15

#16

#18

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for January 11, 2021 at 09:30 AM. Joint Status Report due by January 4, 2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than November 25, 2020. (atc) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docket(#17) Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # ALB048198 (ln)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Evans, Robert) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company re 14 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Notice of Counsel Pro Hac Vice in Good Standing (Irvin, Jason) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docket(#14) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Travelers Commercial Insurance Company by Jason J Irvin on behalf of: Daniel Feinberg Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP 1 N. Franklin St., Suite 800Chicago, IL 60606 312-565-1400 dfeinberg@grsm.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Irvin, Jason)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docket(#13) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Travelers Commercial Insurance Company by Daniel E Feinberg (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Feinberg, Daniel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company (Irvin, Jason) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company.(Irvin, Jason) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason J Irvin on behalf of All Defendants (Irvin, Jason) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketAssociation Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7374316 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Whitley, James) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint, Notice of Judge Assignment and Withdrawal of Counsel served on The Cincinnati Insurance Company on 09-22-20, filed by Chisholm's-Village Plaza LLC. (Hnasko, Thomas) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Ntc of Judge Assignment, Withdrawal of Counsel served on Travelers Commercial Insurance Company on 09-21-20, filed by Chisholm's-Village Plaza LLC. (Hnasko, Thomas) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company on Amended Complaint. (dr) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, VIOLATIONS OF THE NEW MEXICO INSURANCE PRACTICES ACT, BREACH OF THE COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING, NEGLIGENCE AND FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. terminating Will Burke and Burke Insurance Group., filed by Chisholm's-Village Plaza LLC. (Hnasko, Thomas) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Chisholm's-Village Plaza LLC of Withdrawal of Counsel (Hnasko, Thomas) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to All Defendants. (arp) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (arp) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7298168 re #1 Complaint, filed by Chisholm's-Village Plaza LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hnasko, Thomas) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Violations of the NM Ins. Practices Act, Breach of Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, Negligence and for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Chisholm's-Village Plaza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hnasko, Thomas) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Commerical Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert C. Evans

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel E. Feinberg