This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2022 at 13:18:08 (UTC).

Chisholm v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 Chisholm filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Juul Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-05097

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick Chisholm

Defendants

Altria Group, Inc.

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

Altria Client Services LLC

Altria Group Distribution Company

Altria Enterprises LLC

James Monsees

Adam Bowen

Nicholas Pritzker

Hoyoung Huh

Riaz Valani

Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc.

Alternative Ingredients, Inc.

Tobacco Technology, Inc.

eLiquitech, Inc.

McLane Company, Inc.

Eby-Brown Company, LLC

Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.

7-Eleven, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Glenn VanZandt

Attorney at Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles, PC

234 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36103

Andy D. Birchfield, Jr.

Attorney at Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles, LLC

234 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36103-4160

James Wayne Lampkin, II

Attorney at Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles, PC

234 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36103

Sydney Everett

Attorney at Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles, PC

234 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (VanZandt, Joseph) (Filed on 9/8/2022) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to 7-Eleven, Inc., Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2022) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to 7-Eleven, Inc., Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2022) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2913: Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-05097-WHO Chisholm v. Juul Labs, Inc. cc: JPMDL (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2022) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2022) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (VanZandt, Joseph) (Filed on 9/8/2022) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Short-Form Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against 7-Eleven, Inc., Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17515580.). Filed by Patrick Chisholm. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (VanZandt, Joseph) (Filed on 9/8/2022) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 7-Eleven Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Alternative Ingredients, Inc. is a litigant