This case was last updated from PACER on 10/09/2021 at 08:21:36 (UTC).

CHIPOLA HISTORICAL TRUST, INC. v. THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 CHIPOLA HISTORICAL TRUST, INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLEN C WINSOR and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00161

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ALLEN C WINSOR

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHIPOLA HISTORICAL TRUST, INC.

CHIPOLA HISTORICAL TRUST INC

Defendant

THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DONNA DEVANEY STOCKHAM

Attorney at STOCKHAM LAW GROUP - TAMPA FL

109 S Edison Avenue

Tampa, FL 33606

NICOLE CHERI VINSON

Attorney at STOCKHAM LAW GROUP - TAMPA FL

109 S Edison Avenue

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorneys

PAUL HUDSON JONES

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMULLER KATZ CRAIG LLP - TAMPA FL

400 North Ashley Drive, Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

JUAN PABLO CACERES

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMULLER KATZ CRAIG LLP - TAMPA FL

400 North Ashley Drive, Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER CLOSING THE FILE, re #15 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 10/6/2021. This order confirms that the case has been dismissed. The clerk will close the file. (kdm) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (JONES, PAUL) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER REGARDING #13 SETTLEMENT. (Parties to file a stipulation of dismissal on or before 10/25/2021). Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 9/24/2021. (kdm) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

13 #1

Exhibit A: Mediation Disposition Report

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Settlement by CHIPOLA HISTORICAL TRUST INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Mediation Disposition Report) (VINSON, NICOLE) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER entered pursuant to #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 9/15/21. Discovery due by 6/1/2022. Mediation Report due by 6/29/2022. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2022 at 08:30 AM Eastern Time in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. Case referred to mediation. (tss) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (JONES, PAUL) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (JONES, PAUL) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLE CHERI VINSON on behalf of CHIPOLA HISTORICAL TRUST INC (VINSON, NICOLE) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CHIPOLA HISTORICAL TRUST INC. (STOCKHAM, DONNA) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY, INC., Other Affiliate LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP, INC., Other Affiliate OHIO CASUALTY CORPORATION, Other Affiliate PEERLESS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF WAUSAU, Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holding Inc. for THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.. (JONES, PAUL) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (JONES, PAUL) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#5

(#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 8/12/21. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/26/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/13/2021. Discovery due by 2/4/2022. Jury Trial set for 6/29/2022 at 08:30 AM ET in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. (tss) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JUAN PABLO CACERES on behalf of THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (CACERES, JUAN) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #1

Exhibit A

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER CLOSING THE FILE, re #15 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 10/6/2021. This order confirms that the case has been dismissed. The clerk will close the file. (kdm) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (JONES, PAUL) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER REGARDING #13 SETTLEMENT. (Parties to file a stipulation of dismissal on or before 10/25/2021). Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 9/24/2021. (kdm) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Settlement by CHIPOLA HISTORICAL TRUST INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Mediation Disposition Report) (VINSON, NICOLE) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER entered pursuant to #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 9/15/21. Discovery due by 6/1/2022. Mediation Report due by 6/29/2022. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2022 at 08:30 AM Eastern Time in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. Case referred to mediation. (tss) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (JONES, PAUL) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (JONES, PAUL) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLE CHERI VINSON on behalf of CHIPOLA HISTORICAL TRUST INC (VINSON, NICOLE) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CHIPOLA HISTORICAL TRUST INC. (STOCKHAM, DONNA) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY, INC., Other Affiliate LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP, INC., Other Affiliate OHIO CASUALTY CORPORATION, Other Affiliate PEERLESS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF WAUSAU, Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holding Inc. for THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.. (JONES, PAUL) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/26/2021. (***None filed to date.***) (kdm) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (JONES, PAUL) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 8/12/21. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/26/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/13/2021. Discovery due by 2/4/2022. Jury Trial set for 6/29/2022 at 08:30 AM ET in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. (tss) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JUAN PABLO CACERES on behalf of THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (CACERES, JUAN) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL CASE Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number AFLNDC - 6229747. Fee status updated to paid. (kdm) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY from Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, case number 322021CA000138CAAXMX., filed by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (JONES, PAUL) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ohio Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donna DeVaney Stockham(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole Vinson