This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 12:32:43 (UTC).

Chinonso Ohuche v. Autovest, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 Chinonso Ohuche filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Autovest, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Percy Anderson and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04264

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chinonso Ohuche

Defendants

Autovest, L.L.C.

Patrick K. Willis Company, Inc. dba American Recovery Service

Coastline Recovery Services, Inc.

Patrick K. Willis Company, Inc. a California corporation doing business as American Recovery Service

5118 Robert J. Mathews Parkway

El Dorado Hills, CA 95762

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandon A Block

Attorney at Law Offices of Brandon Block APC

9440 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 301

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Defendant Attorneys

R Travis Campbell

Attorney at Simmonds and Narita LLP

44 Montgomery Street Suite 3010

San Francisco, CA 94104-4816

Margaret T Cardasis

Attorney at Simmonds and Narita LLP

44 Montgomery Street Suite 3010

San Francisco, CA 94104-4816

Stephanie Berman Schneider

Attorney at Berman Berman Berman Schneider and Lowary LLP

11900 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 600

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1151

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Because the Court has dismissed all federal claims over which it possessed original subject matter jurisdiction, the Court declines to exercise supplemental over plaintiffs' remaining claims. The action is remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case number 21STCV14766. (See document for details). Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#18

(#18) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: Stipulation to Continue #16 . Pursuant to the Court's Order Setting Scheduling Conference, the deadline for the parties to file their Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Joint Report is June 28, 2021, which is prior to counsel's scheduled leave. The Court therefore denies the parties' Stipulation to the extent it seeks a continuance of the deadline to file the Rule 26(f) Joint Report. The parties shall file the Rule 26(f) Joint Report by no later than July 1, 2021. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Autovest, L.L.C..(Cardasis, Margaret) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

16 #1

Proposed Order

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Plaintiff Chinonso Ohuche(Block, Brandon) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#14

(#14) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 to 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Chinonso Ohuche.. (Block, Brandon) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Chinonso Ohuche pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Coastline Recovery Services, Inc., Patrick K. Willis Company, Inc.. (Block, Brandon) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson re: Notice of Settlement #10 . The Court has been advised by counsel that this matter has settled as to Defendant Patrick K. Willis Company, Inc. The parties have ten (10) days from the date of this order or until the next scheduled court appearance, whichever is shorter, to file with the court a dismissal of this defendant or to appear, in-person or telephonically with their clients, to place the settlement on the record. (mrgo) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#11

(#11) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Defendant Autovest, L.L.C..(Cardasis, Margaret) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#10

(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson re: Notice of Settlement #10 . The Court has been advised by counsel that this matter has settled as to Defendant Patrick K. Willis Company, Inc. The parties have ten (10) days from the date of this order or until the next scheduled court appearance, whichever is shorter, to file with the court a dismissal of this defendant or to appear, in-person or telephonically with their clients, to place the settlement on the record. (mrgo) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Autovest, L.L.C.. (Campbell, R) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Because the Court has dismissed all federal claims over which it possessed original subject matter jurisdiction, the Court declines to exercise supplemental over plaintiffs' remaining claims. The action is remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case number 21STCV14766. (See document for details). Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: Stipulation to Continue #16 . Pursuant to the Court's Order Setting Scheduling Conference, the deadline for the parties to file their Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Joint Report is June 28, 2021, which is prior to counsel's scheduled leave. The Court therefore denies the parties' Stipulation to the extent it seeks a continuance of the deadline to file the Rule 26(f) Joint Report. The parties shall file the Rule 26(f) Joint Report by no later than July 1, 2021. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Autovest, L.L.C..(Cardasis, Margaret) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from July 12, 2021 to August 9, 2021 filed by Defendant Autovest, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cardasis, Margaret) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Plaintiff Chinonso Ohuche(Block, Brandon) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 to 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Chinonso Ohuche.. (Block, Brandon) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Chinonso Ohuche pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Coastline Recovery Services, Inc., Patrick K. Willis Company, Inc.. (Block, Brandon) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson re: Notice of Settlement #10 . The Court has been advised by counsel that this matter has settled as to Defendant Patrick K. Willis Company, Inc. The parties have ten (10) days from the date of this order or until the next scheduled court appearance, whichever is shorter, to file with the court a dismissal of this defendant or to appear, in-person or telephonically with their clients, to place the settlement on the record. (mrgo) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Defendant Autovest, L.L.C..(Cardasis, Margaret) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Autovest, L.L.C., of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal served on May 25, 2021. (Campbell, R) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chinonso Ohuche, upon Defendant Patrick K. Willis Company, Inc. served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Joel Levy-Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/3/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT L) (ghap) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chinonso Ohuche, upon Defendant Autovest, L.L.C. served on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix-Authorized to Accept Service of Process for CSC Lawyers, Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/3/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT K) (ghap) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNON CONFORM COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Chinonso Ohuche, upon Defendant Coastline Recovery Services, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Stephanie Berman Schneider Attorney for Defendant, Attorney for defendant on behalf Coastline Recovery Services, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT H) (ghap) Modified on 5/25/2021 (ghap). (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Autovest, L.L.C., Coastline Recovery Services, Inc., Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Patrick K. Willis Company, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Chinonso Ohuche. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/19/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Autovest, L.L.C., (Campbell, R) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Autovest, L.L.C.. (Campbell, R) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV14766 Receipt No: ACACDC-31337671 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Autovest, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Summons), #3 Exhibit C (Civil Cover Sheet), #4 Exhibit D (ADR Notice), #5 Exhibit E (Notice of Case Assignment), #6 Exhibit F (First Amended General Order), #7 Exhibit G (Stipulation), #8 Exhibit H (Acknowledgment & Receipt), #9 Exhibit I (Peremptory Challenge), #10 Exhibit J (Order Reassigning Judge), #11 Exhibit K (Proof of Service), #12 Exhibit L (Proof of Service), #13 Exhibit M (Consent to Removal)) (Attorney R Travis Campbell added to party Autovest, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Campbell, R) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COASTLINE RECOVERY SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where PATRICK K. WILLIS COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTOVEST, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN RECOVERY SERVICE INCORPORATED is a litigant