This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/20/2019 at 07:04:15 (UTC).

Chin v. Alltran Financial, LP

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 Chin filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Alltran Financial, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Vera M. Scanlon and Dora Lizette Irizarry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04222

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Vera M. Scanlon

Presiding Judge

Dora Lizette Irizarry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Chin

Defendant

Alltran Financial, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mitchell L. Pashkin

775 Park Avenue, Suite 255

Huntington, NY 11743

Defendant Attorney

Denise Lynne Plunkett

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1675 Broadway, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Letter dtd. 8/6/2019 from Suffolk County Court Clerk's Office, enclosing a certified copy of the Clerk's Minutes for the E-filed Supreme Court case under Index# 606890/2019 along with a Notice of Removal. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Alltran Financial, LP. (Plunkett, Denise) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#2

(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/23/2019) (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit B - Demand for Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit A - Summons with Notice

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alltran Financial, LP from Supreme Court of the State of NY, County of Suffolk, Case Number 606890/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11687189). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons with Notice, #3 Exhibit B - Demand for Complaint) (Plunkett, Denise) Modified on 7/23/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter dtd. 8/6/2019 from Suffolk County Court Clerk's Office, enclosing a certified copy of the Clerk's Minutes for the E-filed Supreme Court case under Index# 606890/2019 along with a Notice of Removal. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Alltran Financial, LP. (Plunkett, Denise) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Case Assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/23/2019) (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alltran Financial, LP from Supreme Court of the State of NY, County of Suffolk, Case Number 606890/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11687189). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons with Notice, #3 Exhibit B - Demand for Complaint) (Plunkett, Denise) Modified on 7/23/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLTRAN FINANCIAL, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitchell L. Pashkin