This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:21:11 (UTC).

Childs et al v. San Diego Family Housing LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Childs filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against San Diego Family Housing LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey T. Miller and Mitchell D. Dembin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02329

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey T. Miller

Referral Judge

Mitchell D. Dembin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donald Childs

T. Childs

A. Childs

Lena Childs

Defendants

Indepth Corporation

San Diego Family Housing LLC

Does 1 through 25

Lincoln Military Propoerty Management LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick

Attorney at Fitzpatrick Law, APC

555 West Beech Street, Suite 510

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Vikas Nagpal

Attorney at Bremer Whyte Brown and O'Meara

501 West Broadway, Suite 1750

San Diego, CA 92101

Kristin Nell Reyna

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

101 West Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint to First Amended Complaint by Lincoln Military Propoerty Management LP, San Diego Family Housing LLC.(Reyna, Kristin) (sjt). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/3/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 12/14/2019.(sjt) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

1 #7

Proof of Service

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

11 #1

Declaration DECLARATION OF CHRISTINA A. MATIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT INDEPTHS

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Indepth Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Proof of Service)(Nagpal, Vikas)Attorney Vikas Nagpal added to party Indepth Corporation(pty:dft) (sjt). (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lincoln Military Propoerty Management LP, San Diego Family Housing LLC re #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Answer to Complaint, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Reyna, Kristin) (sjt). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#11

(#11) Ex Parte MOTION For Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Eaarly Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by Indepth Corporation (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 [PROPOSED] ORDER, #3 Proof of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Nagpal, Vikas) Modified to correct event on 1/28/2020 (QC Mailer sent re, incorrect event, proposed order attached)(sjt). (Entered: 01/27/2020)

9 #1

[Proposed] Order

1 #2

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by Indepth Corporation. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Nagpal, Vikas) (jmo). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

11 #3

Proof of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

11 #2

[PROPOSED] ORDER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT INDEPTHS UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATIO

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Military Propoerty Management LP. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Reyna, Kristin) (sjt). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Defendants' Confirmation of Notification to State Court of Removal by Lincoln Military Propoerty Management LP, San Diego Family Housing LLC (Reyna, Kristin) (sjt). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

8 #2

Proof of Service

8 #1

Declaration Corporate Disclosure Statement

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by San Diego Family Housing LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Reyna, Kristin)(sjt). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Defendant INDEPTH's Motion for Leave of Insurance Carrier Representative to Appear at the Early Neutral Evaluation/Case Management Conference by Telephone. The Court finds good cause to allow Defendant INDEPTH's Senior Claim's Adjuster to appear telephonically at the ENE/CMC set for February 11, 2020. Defendant INDEPTH should note that if the parties in attendance do not have "full authority to negotiate and enter into settlement" as stated in their motion, sanctions may be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 01/29/2020. (no document attached) (atk) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Ex Parte MOTION For Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Eaarly Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by Indepth Corporation (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 [PROPOSED] ORDER, #3 Proof of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Nagpal, Vikas) Modified to correct event on 1/28/2020 (QC Mailer sent re, incorrect event, proposed order attached)(sjt). (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation/Case Management Conference: The Court finds good cause to continue the ENE/CMC currently set for February 3, 2020 to February 11, 2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. The Joint Discovery Plan and Confidential Settlement Conference briefs are due on or before February 5, 2020. All other provisions, including the mandatory appearance of parties with full settlement authority, remain unchanged from the Court's prior order of December 14, 2019. #7 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 01/13/2020. (no document attached) (atk) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by Indepth Corporation. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Nagpal, Vikas) (jmo). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Indepth Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Proof of Service)(Nagpal, Vikas)Attorney Vikas Nagpal added to party Indepth Corporation(pty:dft) (sjt). (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/3/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 12/14/2019.(sjt) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lincoln Military Propoerty Management LP, San Diego Family Housing LLC re #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Answer to Complaint, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Reyna, Kristin) (sjt). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Military Propoerty Management LP. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Reyna, Kristin) (sjt). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by San Diego Family Housing LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Reyna, Kristin)(sjt). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint to First Amended Complaint by Lincoln Military Propoerty Management LP, San Diego Family Housing LLC.(Reyna, Kristin) (sjt). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Defendants' Confirmation of Notification to State Court of Removal by Lincoln Military Propoerty Management LP, San Diego Family Housing LLC (Reyna, Kristin) (sjt). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2019-00022759-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13238436.), filed by Lincoln Military Propoerty Management LP, San Diego Family Housing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Declaration of Kristin N. Reyna DeHart, #6 Exhibit 1-8, #7 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02329-JM-MDD. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(jxv) (sjt). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.