This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/21/2019 at 10:19:45 (UTC).

Childress v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 Childress filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L. Viken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05016

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey L. Viken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emily Childress

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J. Simpson

Attorney at Julius & Simpson, L.L.P.

801 Mt. Rushmore Rd., Suite 203

Rapid City, SD 57701

Defendant Attorneys

Peter E. Pederson

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N. Franklin St., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Daniel K. Ryan

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N. Franklin St., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Paul H. Linde

Attorney at Schaffer Law Office, Prof. LLC

412 West 9Th Street, Suite 1

Sioux Falls, SD 57104-3602

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Summons

2 #2

AO 85 form

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#10

#11

#12

#13

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 4/22/19. (SB) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Linde, Paul) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel K. Ryan. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 4/4/19. (SB) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter E. Pederson. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 4/4/19. (SB) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 4/23/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 3/27/19. (SB) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3022105) by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Linde, Paul) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Attorney Peter E. Pederson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3021988) by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Linde, Paul) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROPOSED ORDER by Life Insurance Company of North America re #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Linde, Paul) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Linde, Paul) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul H. Linde on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Linde, Paul) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ADMISSION OF SERVICE Executed by Larry Deiter, Director of Div. of Insurance Admission filed by Emily Childress. (Simpson, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. 1 original summons, 1 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85 form)(SKK) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, ($400 fee paid, receipt# SDX500005692) filed by Emily Childress. (SKK) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter E. Pederson, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Keenan Ryan