This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2021 at 08:57:14 (UTC).

CHICAIZA v. TARGET CORP. et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 CHICAIZA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TARGET CORP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin McNulty and Andre M. Espinosa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-19078

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

Referral Judge

Andre M. Espinosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARIAMEN CHICAIZA

Defendants

TARGET CORP.

ABC CORP. 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUZANNE SMITH

Attorney at CILLICK & SMITH

25 Main Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPHER EUGENE MCINTYRE

Attorney at FISHMAN MCINTYRE LEVINE SAMANSKY P.C.

120 Eagle Rock Avenue

East Hanover, NJ 07936-3158

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by TARGET CORP..(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference in Arbitration case for 1/26/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 12/14/2021. (spc) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference in Arbitration case for 1/26/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 12/14/2021. (spc) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by TARGET CORP..(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (jr) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TARGET CORP.. (MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TARGET CORP. from BERGEN COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number BER-L-5896-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12912700), filed by TARGET CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPHER EUGENE MCINTYRE