This case was last updated from PACER on 10/04/2021 at 07:32:23 (UTC).

Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund et al v. Colella Concrete, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 Chicago Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Colella Concrete, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John F. Kness. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04170

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Kness

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund

Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Health & Welfare Plan

Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Retiree Health & Welfare Plan

Catherine Wenskus

Defendants

Colella Concrete, Inc.

Rose Colella

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karen I. Engelhardt

Attorney at Allison, Slutsky & Kennedy, P.C.

230 West Monroe Street, Suite 2600

Chicago, IL 60606

Miranda Huber

Attorney at Allison, Slutsky & Kennedy, P.C.

230 W. Monroe Street, Suite 2600

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorney

Joseph Patrick Berglund

Attorney at Berglund & Mastny PC

1010 Jorie Boulevard, #370

Oakbrook, IL 60523

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Colella Concrete, Inc.(Berglund, Joseph) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Motion for extension of time to answer #8 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 9/21/2021. Mailed notice (ags) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION by Defendant Colella Concrete, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 (Berglund, Joseph) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Colella Concrete, Inc. by Joseph Patrick Berglund (Berglund, Joseph) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Health & Welfare Plan, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Retiree Health & Welfare Plan, Catherine Wenskus by Miranda Huber (Huber, Miranda) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Wenskus, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Retiree Health & Welfare Plan, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Health & Welfare Plan as to Rose Colella on 8/14/2021, answer due 9/6/2021. (Engelhardt, Karen) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Wenskus, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Retiree Health & Welfare Plan, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Health & Welfare Plan as to Colella Concrete, Inc. on 8/14/2021, answer due 9/6/2021. (Engelhardt, Karen) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Health & Welfare Plan, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Retiree Health & Welfare Plan, Catherine Wenskus by Karen I. Engelhardt (Engelhardt, Karen) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Engelhardt, Karen) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A - C Exhibits

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Catherine Wenskus, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Retiree Health & Welfare Plan, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Health & Welfare Plan; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18535175. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C Exhibits)(Engelhardt, Karen) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Colella Concrete, Inc.(Berglund, Joseph) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Motion for extension of time to answer #8 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 9/21/2021. Mailed notice (ags) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Defendant Colella Concrete, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 (Berglund, Joseph) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Colella Concrete, Inc. by Joseph Patrick Berglund (Berglund, Joseph) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Health & Welfare Plan, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Retiree Health & Welfare Plan, Catherine Wenskus by Miranda Huber (Huber, Miranda) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Wenskus, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Retiree Health & Welfare Plan, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Health & Welfare Plan as to Rose Colella on 8/14/2021, answer due 9/6/2021. (Engelhardt, Karen) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Wenskus, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Retiree Health & Welfare Plan, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Health & Welfare Plan as to Colella Concrete, Inc. on 8/14/2021, answer due 9/6/2021. (Engelhardt, Karen) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Rose Colella, Colella Concrete, Inc. (mxo, ) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, ) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Health & Welfare Plan, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Retiree Health & Welfare Plan, Catherine Wenskus by Karen I. Engelhardt (Engelhardt, Karen) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Engelhardt, Karen) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Catherine Wenskus, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Retiree Health & Welfare Plan, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Health & Welfare Plan; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18535175. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C Exhibits)(Engelhardt, Karen) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund is a litigant