This case was last updated from PACER on 01/10/2021 at 07:25:27 (UTC).

Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund et al v. Allianz SE et al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2020 Chicago Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago Vicinity Laborers District Council Health Welfare Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Allianz SE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-09478

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund

Catherine Wenskus, Administrator

Catherine Wenskus

Defendants

Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc.

Allianz SE

PFP Holdings Inc.

Allianz Asset Management GmbH

Allianz of America Inc.

Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC

Allianz Asset Management of America LLC

Allianz Asset Management of America L.P.

Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Dains Blatchley

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Hannah Elizabeth Ross

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

James Abram Harrod, III

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Defendant Attorneys

Ann-Elizabeth Ostrager

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr.

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Kathleen Suzanne McArthur

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Hilary M. Williams

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Stephanie G Wheeler

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Mary Elizabeth Brust

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP (NYC)

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Amy D. Roy

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

800 Boylston

Boston, MA 02199

Cole A Goodman

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

Prudential Tower, 800 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02199

Robert A. Skinner

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP (MA)

800 Boylston St

Boston, MA 02199

 

Court Documents

#54

(#54) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ESI PROTOCOL: The parties ("Parties") in the above-captioned actions ("Related Actions") have agreed to the terms of this Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding ESI Protocol ("ESI Protocol") to govern the form of productions made by the Parties. Accordingly, it is ORDERED: Absent special circumstances, the specifications set forth in this ESI Protocol shall govern the production of all documents and electronically stored information ("ESI") by the Parties during discovery in the Related Actions and further set forth in this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in case numbers 20-cv-5615, 20-cv-5817, 20-cv-7061, 20-cv-7154, 20-cv-7606, 20-cv-7842, 20-cv-7952, 20-cv-8642, 20-cv-9478, 20-cv-9479, 20-cv-9587, and 20-cv-10028. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/22/2020) (rro) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#53

(#53) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... This confidentiality agreement does not bind the Court or any of its personnel. The Court can modify this stipulation at any time. The Court will retain jurisdiction over the terms and conditions of this agreement only for the pendency of this litigation. Any party wishing to make redacted or sealed submissions shall comply with Rule 6(A) of this Court's Individual Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in case numbers 20-cv-5615, 20-cv-5817, 20-cv-7061, 20-cv-7154, 20-cv-7606, 20-cv-7842, 20-cv-7952, 20-cv-8642, 20-cv-9478, 20-cv-9479, 20-cv-9587, and 20-cv-10028. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/22/2020) (rro) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#52

(#52) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#51

(#51) PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#50

(#50) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #52) - PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings Inc...(Giuffra, Robert) Modified on 12/22/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#49

(#49) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #51) - PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings Inc...(Giuffra, Robert) Modified on 12/22/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#48

(#48) STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1): NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), Plaintiffs the Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund and the Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Health & Welfare Fund (collectively, "Chicago Laborers"), and Catherine Wenskus, Administrator of the Chicago Laborers (together with Chicago Laborers, "Plaintiffs"), by and through the undersigned counsel, hereby voluntarily dismiss all claims against Defendants Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz of America, Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Asset Management of America LP, and PFP Holdings Inc. (collectively, the "Affiliate Defendants," and together with Plaintiffs, the "Parties") without prejudice to their inclusion at a later time. 2. The Parties agree that, to the extent permitted by applicable law, any statute of limitations, statute of repose, or other time-related defenses or claims shall be tolled as to the Affiliate Defendants as if the claims were filed on November 12, 2020, the filing date of the Complaint (ECF No. 1) until December 7, 2021, one year from the date of entry of the CMP entered by the Court on December 7, 2020 (ECF No. 46) (the Tolling Period). 3. The Parties shall meet and confer no later than 30 days prior to the end of the Tolling Period to discuss extending the Tolling Period on mutual consent. 4. The Affiliate Defendants agree that they will not oppose an amendment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 asserting claims against the Affiliate Defendants as defendants or including any allegations relating to the Affiliate Defendants. The Affiliate Defendants reserve all of their rights and defenses in the event an amended complaint asserting such claims is filed, including the right to move to dismiss the complaint. 5. The voluntary dismissal of the Affiliate Defendants is further subject to theprovisions for tolling of these dismissed claims and other terms and conditions set forth in Paragraph 4 of the CMP. IT IS SO ORDERED., Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC terminated. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/11/2020) (ama) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#47

(#47) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus..(Harrod, James) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#9

(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Global Investors US LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Administrator..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Administrator..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Administrator..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Administrator..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Administrator..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Asset Management GmbH, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Administrator..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to (Civil Case 1:20-cv-5615 (KPF)). Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Administrator..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#1

(#10) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz of America Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Administrator..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#53

(#46) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN #1: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). AllianzGI US's Opening Brief(s): February 25, 2021. Plaintiffs' Opposition Brief(s): 4/26/2021. AllianzGI US's Reply(ies): May 26, 2021. Any amendments of the complaints in the Related Actions after December 24, 2020 shall be either with the opposing party's written consent or the Court's leave. Plaintiffs reserve their rights to amend under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1). Fact discovery shall be completed no later than June 10, 2022. The Court does not anticipate granting any extensions of fact discovery. Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/7/2020) (rro) Modified on 12/7/2020 (rro). (Entered: 12/07/2020)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ESI PROTOCOL: The parties ("Parties") in the above-captioned actions ("Related Actions") have agreed to the terms of this Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding ESI Protocol ("ESI Protocol") to govern the form of productions made by the Parties. Accordingly, it is ORDERED: Absent special circumstances, the specifications set forth in this ESI Protocol shall govern the production of all documents and electronically stored information ("ESI") by the Parties during discovery in the Related Actions and further set forth in this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in case numbers 20-cv-5615, 20-cv-5817, 20-cv-7061, 20-cv-7154, 20-cv-7606, 20-cv-7842, 20-cv-7952, 20-cv-8642, 20-cv-9478, 20-cv-9479, 20-cv-9587, and 20-cv-10028. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/22/2020) (rro) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... This confidentiality agreement does not bind the Court or any of its personnel. The Court can modify this stipulation at any time. The Court will retain jurisdiction over the terms and conditions of this agreement only for the pendency of this litigation. Any party wishing to make redacted or sealed submissions shall comply with Rule 6(A) of this Court's Individual Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in case numbers 20-cv-5615, 20-cv-5817, 20-cv-7061, 20-cv-7154, 20-cv-7606, 20-cv-7842, 20-cv-7952, 20-cv-8642, 20-cv-9478, 20-cv-9479, 20-cv-9587, and 20-cv-10028. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/22/2020) (rro) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #52) - PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings Inc...(Giuffra, Robert) Modified on 12/22/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #51) - PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings Inc...(Giuffra, Robert) Modified on 12/22/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1): NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), Plaintiffs the Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund and the Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Health & Welfare Fund (collectively, "Chicago Laborers"), and Catherine Wenskus, Administrator of the Chicago Laborers (together with Chicago Laborers, "Plaintiffs"), by and through the undersigned counsel, hereby voluntarily dismiss all claims against Defendants Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz of America, Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Asset Management of America LP, and PFP Holdings Inc. (collectively, the "Affiliate Defendants," and together with Plaintiffs, the "Parties") without prejudice to their inclusion at a later time. 2. The Parties agree that, to the extent permitted by applicable law, any statute of limitations, statute of repose, or other time-related defenses or claims shall be tolled as to the Affiliate Defendants as if the claims were filed on November 12, 2020, the filing date of the Complaint (ECF No. 1) until December 7, 2021, one year from the date of entry of the CMP entered by the Court on December 7, 2020 (ECF No. 46) (the Tolling Period). 3. The Parties shall meet and confer no later than 30 days prior to the end of the Tolling Period to discuss extending the Tolling Period on mutual consent. 4. The Affiliate Defendants agree that they will not oppose an amendment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 asserting claims against the Affiliate Defendants as defendants or including any allegations relating to the Affiliate Defendants. The Affiliate Defendants reserve all of their rights and defenses in the event an amended complaint asserting such claims is filed, including the right to move to dismiss the complaint. 5. The voluntary dismissal of the Affiliate Defendants is further subject to theprovisions for tolling of these dismissed claims and other terms and conditions set forth in Paragraph 4 of the CMP. IT IS SO ORDERED., Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC terminated. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/11/2020) (ama) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus..(Harrod, James) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: ( Brief due by 2/25/2021., Reply to Response to Brief due by 5/26/2021., Responses to Brief due by 4/26/2021), Set/Reset Hearings:( Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (rro) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN #1: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). AllianzGI US's Opening Brief(s): February 25, 2021. Plaintiffs' Opposition Brief(s): 4/26/2021. AllianzGI US's Reply(ies): May 26, 2021. Any amendments of the complaints in the Related Actions after December 24, 2020 shall be either with the opposing party's written consent or the Court's leave. Plaintiffs reserve their rights to amend under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1). Fact discovery shall be completed no later than June 10, 2022. The Court does not anticipate granting any extensions of fact discovery. Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/7/2020) (rro) Modified on 12/7/2020 (rro). (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz of America Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Administrator..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Global Investors US LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Administrator..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Administrator..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Administrator..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Administrator..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Administrator..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Asset Management GmbH, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Administrator..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to (Civil Case 1:20-cv-5615 (KPF)). Document filed by Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Administrator..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22543344)Document filed by Catherine Wenskus, Administrator, Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Pension Fund and Chicago & Vicinity Laborers District Council Health & Welfare Fund..(Ross, Hannah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PFP Holdings Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Chicago & Vicinity Laborers' District Council Pension Fund is a litigant