This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2019 at 10:04:06 (UTC).

Chicago Title Ins. Co. vs. Thompson/Morgan Baton Rouge I, DST, et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2019 Chicago Title Ins Co filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Thompson/Morgan Baton Rouge I, DST. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Telesca and Jonathan W. Feldman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-06303

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Telesca

Referral Judge

Jonathan W. Feldman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants, Cross Defendants, Cross Claimants and Counter Claimants

BATON ROUGE MULTIFAMILY DST

BATON ROUGE SIGNATORY TRUSTEE LLC

THOMPSON/MORGAN PROPERTIES LLC

TNP MORGAN, LLC

MORGAN DST JV LLC

CLEARVIEW REAL ESTATE CAPITAL, LLC

TNP PROPERTY MANAGER, LLC

TNP/MORGANBATON ROUGE APARTMENTS, LLC

THOMPSON/MORGAN BATON ROUGE I, DST

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Joyce A. Davis

Attorney at Fidelity National Law Group

350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3000

New York, NY 10118

Defendant, Cross Defendant, Cross Claimant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Randolph C. Oppenheimer

Attorney at Barclay Damon, LLP

200 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1200

Buffalo, NY 14202

Trishe' L.A. Hynes

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203-2887

Alan J. Bozer

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203-2887

Erin C. Borek

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203-2887

Kyle D. Gooch

Attorney at Harris Beach PLLC

99 Garnsey Road

Pittsford, NY 14534

Dale A. Worrall

Attorney at Harris Beach LLP

99 Garnsey Road

Pittsford, NY 14534

Robert B. Calihan

Attorney at Calihan Law PLLC

620 Reynolds Arcade Building, 16 East Main Street

Rochester, NY 14614

Alice Lyons Messina

Attorney at Leclair Korona Cole LLP

28 E. Main Street, Suite 1500

Rochester, NY 14614

Paul L. Leclair

Attorney at Leclair Korona Cole LLP

28 E. Main Street, Suite 1500

Rochester, NY 14614

 

Court Documents

55 #5

Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Clearview Motio

55 #4

Exhibit Exhibit B - Commission Agreement

55 #3

Declaration Declaration of David Rumsey

55 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Joint Amended Answer

55 #1

Declaration Attorney Declaration of Paul L. Leclair

#55

#54

#53

#52

4 #9

Summons In A Civil Action -BATON ROUGE SIGNATORY TRUSTEE LLC

4 #5

Summons In A Civil Action - TNP PROPERTY MANAGER, LLC

4 #4

Summons In A Civil Action - THOMPSON-MORGAN PROPERTIES LLC

4 #3

Summons In A Civil Action - THOMPSON-MORGAN BATON ROUGE APARTMENTS, LLC

4 #2

Summons In A Civil Action - CLEARVIEW REAL ESTATE CAPITAL, LLC

4 #1

Summons In A Civil Action - BATON ROUGE MULTIFAMILY DST

#3

#2

#1

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) MOTION for an Order pursuant to Rules 15 and 24 of the FRCP permitting ClearView Real Estate Capital LLC (WA) to intervene as a party defendant, allowing ClearView Real Estate Capital LLC (NY) to amend Defendant ClearView Real Estate Capital, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, and amend the caption by CLEARVIEW REAL ESTATE CAPITAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Attorney Declaration of Paul L. Leclair, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Joint Amended Answer, #3 Declaration Declaration of David Rumsey, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Commission Agreement, #5 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Clearview Motion to Intervene, etc.)(Leclair, Paul) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) DECLARATION filed by BATON ROUGE MULTIFAMILY DST in Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment filed by BATON ROUGE MULTIFAMILY DST. (Oppenheimer, Randolph) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Letter filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY as to MORGAN DST JV LLC, CLEARVIEW REAL ESTATE CAPITAL, LLC, BATON ROUGE MULTIFAMILY DST, TNP PROPERTY MANAGER, LLC, THOMPSON/MORGAN BATON ROUGE I, DST, TNP/MORGANBATON ROUGE APARTMENTS, LLC, THOMPSON/MORGAN PROPERTIES LLC, BATON ROUGE SIGNATORY TRUSTEE LLC, TNP MORGAN, LLC Letter to Hon. Feldman. (Davis, Joyce) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Defendant's ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim,, of Defendants TNP/Morgan Baton Rouge Apartments LLC, Thompson/Morgan Properties, LLC, and Morgan DST JV, LLC's Crossclaim by CLEARVIEW REAL ESTATE CAPITAL, LLC.(Leclair, Paul) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Defendant's ANSWER to #37 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, of Defendants TNP Morgan, LLC and TNP Property Manager, LLC's Crossclaim by CLEARVIEW REAL ESTATE CAPITAL, LLC.(Leclair, Paul) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Defendant's ANSWER to #27 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim,, of Defendants Baton Rouge Signatory Trustee LLC and Thompson/Morgan Baton Rouge I, DST's Crossclaim by CLEARVIEW REAL ESTATE CAPITAL, LLC.(Leclair, Paul) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ANSWER to #27 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim,, of the Thompson Defendants by MORGAN DST JV LLC, THOMPSON/MORGAN PROPERTIES LLC, TNP/MORGANBATON ROUGE APARTMENTS, LLC.(Worrall, Dale) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Plaintiff's ANSWER to #37 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, of Defendants TNP Morgan, LLC and TNP Property Manager, LLC by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Davis, Joyce) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Plaintiff's ANSWER to #27 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim,, of Defendants TNP Morgan, LLC and TNP Property Manager, LLC by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Davis, Joyce) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MORGAN DST JV LLC, THOMPSON/MORGAN PROPERTIES LLC, TNP/MORGANBATON ROUGE APARTMENTS, LLC. (Worrall, Dale) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued, on Defendants TNP/Morgan Baton Rouge Apartments, LLC, Thompson/Morgan Baton Rouge 1, DST, Baton Rouge Signatory Trustee LLC, Morgan DST JV LLC and Thompson/Morgan Properties LLC,TNP Morgan, LLC, TNP Property Manager and ClearView Real Estate Capital, LLC (Davis, Joyce) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to BATON ROUGE MULTIFAMILY DST, BATON ROUGE SIGNATORY TRUSTEE LLC, CLEARVIEW REAL ESTATE CAPITAL, LLC, MORGAN DST JV LLC, THOMPSON/MORGAN BATON ROUGE I, DST, THOMPSON/MORGAN PROPERTIES LLC, TNP MORGAN, LLC, TNP PROPERTY MANAGER, LLC, TNP/MORGANBATON ROUGE APARTMENTS, LLC. (TF) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Chicago Title Insurance Company, a Florida corporation, is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Corporate Parent Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., is a wholly owned subsidiary of FNTG Holdings, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Corporate Parent FNTG holdings, LLC is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Fidelity National Financial, Inc. is a publicly-traded holding company and ultimate parent of Chicago Title Insurance Company for CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Davis, Joyce) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. to #1 Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Summons In A Civil Action - BATON ROUGE MULTIFAMILY DST, #2 Summons In A Civil Action - CLEARVIEW REAL ESTATE CAPITAL, LLC, #3 Summons In A Civil Action - THOMPSON-MORGAN BATON ROUGE APARTMENTS, LLC, #4 Summons In A Civil Action - THOMPSON-MORGAN PROPERTIES LLC, #5 Summons In A Civil Action - TNP PROPERTY MANAGER, LLC, #6 Summons In A Civil Action - Morgan DST JV LLC, #7 Summons In A Civil Action - THOMPSON-MORGAN BATON ROUGE I, DST, #8 Summons In A Civil Action - TNP MORGAN, LLC, #9 Summons In A Civil Action -BATON ROUGE SIGNATORY TRUSTEE LLC)(Davis, Joyce) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Funds Into the Court's Registry filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Davis, Joyce) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Davis, Joyce) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Interpleader and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3431816, filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Davis, Joyce) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TNP PROPERTY MANAGER, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CLEARVIEW REAL ESTATE CAPITAL, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant