This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2020 at 08:32:09 (UTC).

Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust et al v. Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Chicago Area I B of T Pension Plan Trust filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Allianz Global Investors U S LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07952

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust

Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust

Defendants

Allianz of America Inc.

Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc.

Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC

Allianz SE

Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC

Allianz Asset Management of America, LLC

Allianz Asset Management of America L.P.

PFP Holdings, Inc.

Allianz Asset Management GmbH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frederic Scott Fox, Sr

Attorney at Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP (NYC)

850 Third Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Donald R. Hall, Jr

Attorney at Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP (NYC)

850 Third Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Joseph M Vanek

Attorney at Vanek, Vickers & Masini PC

55 W. Monroe, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60603

John Paul Bjork

Attorney at Vanek Vickers & Masini

55 W. Monroe Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Ann-Elizabeth Ostrager

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr.

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Kathleen Suzanne McArthur

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Hilary M. Williams

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Stephanie G Wheeler

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Mary Elizabeth Brust

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP (NYC)

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Amy D. Roy

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

800 Boylston

Boston, MA 02199

Cole A Goodman

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

Prudential Tower, 800 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02199

Robert A. Skinner

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP (MA)

800 Boylston St

Boston, MA 02199

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Asset Management of America, LLC, PFP Holdings, Inc.; Corporate Parent Allianz SE for Allianz Asset Management GmbH; Corporate Parent Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Asset Management of America L.P.; Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz of America Inc.; Corporate Parent Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc.; Corporate Parent PFP Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC; Corporate Parent Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings, Inc...(Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

41 #1

Exhibit Chart of Related Actions

#41

(#41) LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated 11/16/2020 re: Related Actions. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chart of Related Actions).(Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#40

(#40) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald R. Hall, Jr on behalf of Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Hall, Donald) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#39

(#39) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Frederic S. Fox dated November 12, 2020 re: Initial Pretrial Conference [Corrected Joint Letter]. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#38

(#38) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated 11/12/2020 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings, Inc...(Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#36

(#36) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie G Wheeler on behalf of Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings, Inc...(Wheeler, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#35

(#35) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #32 Motion for Joseph M. Vanek to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 32. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/26/2020) (rro) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#44

(#37) SCHEDULING ORDER: The joint initial pretrial conference scheduled for November 17, 2020, will be held via video conference, with remote, listen-only audio access for the public available by using dial-in (888) 363-4749 and access code 5123533. The video link will be provided to participants in advance of the conference. The parties to each case shall file a joint pre-conference letter for that case on or before Thursday, November 12, 2020, as required by the Court's Order providing notice of the initial pretrial conference. The parties need not submit a proposed case management plan at this time. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in case numbers 20-cv-5615, 20-cv-5817, 20-cv-7061, 20-cv-7154, 20-cv-7606, 20-cv-7842, 20-cv-7952, and 20-cv-8642. (Initial Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/9/2020) (rro) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#9

(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALLIANZ SE, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALLIANZ ASSET MANAGEMENT GMBH, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALLIANZ OF AMERICA INC., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PFP HOLDINGS, INC., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALLIANZ ASSET MANAGEMENT OF AMERICA LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALLIANZ ASSET MANAGEMENT OF AMERICA L.P., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) Modified on 9/28/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fox, Frederic) Modified on 9/28/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#1

(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALLIANZ SE, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Asset Management of America, LLC, PFP Holdings, Inc.; Corporate Parent Allianz SE for Allianz Asset Management GmbH; Corporate Parent Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Asset Management of America L.P.; Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz of America Inc.; Corporate Parent Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc.; Corporate Parent PFP Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC; Corporate Parent Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings, Inc...(Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated 11/16/2020 re: Related Actions. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chart of Related Actions).(Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald R. Hall, Jr on behalf of Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Hall, Donald) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Frederic S. Fox dated November 12, 2020 re: Initial Pretrial Conference [Corrected Joint Letter]. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated 11/12/2020 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings, Inc...(Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) SCHEDULING ORDER: The joint initial pretrial conference scheduled for November 17, 2020, will be held via video conference, with remote, listen-only audio access for the public available by using dial-in (888) 363-4749 and access code 5123533. The video link will be provided to participants in advance of the conference. The parties to each case shall file a joint pre-conference letter for that case on or before Thursday, November 12, 2020, as required by the Court's Order providing notice of the initial pretrial conference. The parties need not submit a proposed case management plan at this time. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in case numbers 20-cv-5615, 20-cv-5817, 20-cv-7061, 20-cv-7154, 20-cv-7606, 20-cv-7842, 20-cv-7952, and 20-cv-8642. (Initial Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/9/2020) (rro) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie G Wheeler on behalf of Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings, Inc...(Wheeler, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #32 Motion for Joseph M. Vanek to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 32. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/26/2020) (rro) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #33 Motion for John P. Bjork to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 33. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/26/2020) (rro) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #33 MOTION for John Paul Bjork to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22284220. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-05615. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALLIANZ SE, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALLIANZ ASSET MANAGEMENT GMBH, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALLIANZ OF AMERICA INC., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PFP HOLDINGS, INC., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALLIANZ ASSET MANAGEMENT OF AMERICA LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALLIANZ ASSET MANAGEMENT OF AMERICA L.P., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust, Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) Modified on 9/28/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fox, Frederic) Modified on 9/28/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21851325)Document filed by Local 703 I.B. of T., Grocery and Food Employees Pension Plan & Trust, Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Plan & Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chicago Area I.B. of T. Pension Trust Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where PFP Holdings Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Allianz Asset Management GmbH is a litigant