This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:58:42 (UTC).

Chiang v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Chiang filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is James K. Bredar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03478

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James K. Bredar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mea Chiang

Stevenson, MD 21153

Defendant

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Syed Mohsin Reza

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

401 9Th Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/24/2020. (c/m 1/27/2020) (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#9

(#9) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Reza, Syed) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#8

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Summons

1 #5

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit A

1 #6

Exhibit C

1 #9

Exhibit F

1 #8

Exhibit E

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., filed by Mea Chiang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 USM 285 Forms, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F)(ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #7

Exhibit D

1 #3

USM 285 Forms

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020.(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

4 #1

USM forms

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/24/2020. (c/m 1/27/2020) (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Reza, Syed) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) [FILED IN ERROR - wrong document attached by atty] Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Reza, Syed) Modified on 1/27/2020 (krs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020.(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued 21 days as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 USM forms)(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting plaintiff 21 days to provide a service copy of the complaint. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 12/17/2019. (c/m 12/18/19) (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mea Chiang(ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., filed by Mea Chiang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 USM 285 Forms, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F)(ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.